EP1410720 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FROZEN "YUBA" [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Oil Company, Ltd. 1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0086 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Fuji Oil Company, Ltd. 1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0086 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKASAKA, Mizuho, c/o Fuji Oil Company, Limited 18-24, Hamanaka-cho 2-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0875 / JP | 02 /
NAKATANI, Shin, c/o Fuji Oil Company, Limited 18-24, Hamanaka-cho 2-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0875 / JP | 03 /
ADACHI, Tomohiko, c/o Fuji Oil Company, Limited 18-24, Hamanaka-cho 2-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0875 / JP | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02747711.6 | 22.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002JP07399 | Priority number, date | JP20010223893 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001223893 | [2004/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03009706 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1410720 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/20, A23C11/10, A23C20/02 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A23C11/103 (EP,KR,US);
A23L11/45 (EP,KR,US);
A23J3/16 (EP,KR,US);
A23L3/16 (KR);
A23L3/36 (KR);
A23V2300/20 (KR);
A23V2300/24 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | A23L1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEFRORENEM "YUBA" | [2004/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FROZEN "YUBA" | [2004/17] | French: | PROCESSUS DE PRODUCTION DE "YUBA" CONGELE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2003 | Translation filed | 18.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 23.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06343410 ; | [A]JPH10179098 ; | [A]JPH07132062 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP06343410 A 19941220 (MITSUTOYO CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10179098 A 19980707 (FUJI OIL CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07132062 A 19950523 (SHIYOUBEE:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2001057860 (MITSUKAN GROUP HONSHA KK) |