EP1425464 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INK JET PRINTING ON TEXTILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Scientific Licensing, LLC Mail Code A15, P.O. Box 1085 Thousand Oaks, CA 91358-0085 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Rockwell Scientific Licensing, LLC Mail Code A15, P.O. Box 1085 Thousand Oaks, CA 91358-0085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDBERG, Ira 54 Westbury Court Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 02 /
KENDIG, Martin 496 Hillsborough Street Thousand Oaks, CA 91361 / US | 03 /
LUCAS, Rachel 54 Westbury Court Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 04 /
MC KINNEY, Ted 5156 Colina Way Riverside, CA 92507-0600 / US | 05 /
RYANG, Hong-Son 117 Encino Avenue Camarillo, CA 93010 / US | 06 /
ALPER, Leonard 1323 Branta Drive Glendale, CA 91208 / US | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02747999.7 | 24.06.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002US20488 | Priority number, date | US20010952614 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: US 952614 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03023131 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425464 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06P5/00, B41M7/00, B41J3/407 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
D06P5/30 (EP,KR,US);
B41J11/0015 (EP,US);
B41J11/00214 (EP,US);
B41J11/0022 (EP,US);
B41J3/4078 (EP,US);
D06P1/525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEDRUCKEN VON TEXTILIEN MITTELS EINES TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKERS | [2004/24] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INK JET PRINTING ON TEXTILES | [2004/24] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE SUR TEXTILE | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/28] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0904950 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-17,20-30,32,35-39 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0089] *; | [X]US5922625 (HARUTA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8-17,20-32,35-38 * column 3, line 15 - column 9, line 8 *; | [X]JPH08311782 ; | [X]WO0158697 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,12,28,38 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 13 *; | [X]JPH0959700 ; | [DX]US4702742 (IWATA KAZUO [JP], et al) [DX] 39 * column 2, line 7 - column 9, line 15 *; | [A]EP0600578 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 24,25 * page 6, line 55 - page 7, line 29 *; | [DA]US5853861 (HELD ROBERT PAUL [US]) [DA] 39 * column 4, line 47 - line 49 * * column 7, line 13 - line 19 * * column 10, line 23 - line 47 *; | [DA]US5698478 (YAMAMOTO TOMOYA [JP], et al) [DA] 2,3,16,31 * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 40 *; | [DA]US6001137 (ALFEKRI DHEYA [US], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08311782 A 19961126 (KONICA CORP) [X] 39 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0088] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09059700 A 19970304 (TOUPE:KK;ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0033] * | by applicant | US6001137 | US4702742 | US5698478 |