EP1412851 - RADIO SYSTEM UTILIZING OPEN SYSTEMS SOFTWARE SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham MA 02451-1449 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BICKLE, Gerald, L. 5180 East Little Turtle Trail Columbia City, IN 46725 / US | 02 /
MARKS, Jimmie, T. 1319 Timberlake Trail Fort Wayne, IN 46804 / US | 03 /
EYERMANN, Philip, A. 6031 East 500 North Churubusco, IN 46723 / US | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Jones, Graham H. Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 02748267.8 | 29.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002US24042 | Priority number, date | US20010308270P | 27.07.2001 Original published format: US 308270 P | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03012638 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412851 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/547 (EP,US);
G06F9/46 (EP,US);
G06F9/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKSYSTEM MIT OPEN-SYSTEMS-SOFTWARE-UNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2004/18] | English: | RADIO SYSTEM UTILIZING OPEN SYSTEMS SOFTWARE SUPPORT | [2004/18] | French: | SYSTEME RADIO FAISANT APPEL A UN SUPPORT LOGICIEL DE SYSTEMES OUVERTS | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/32] | 05.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/32] | Divisional application(s) | EP09000910.1 / EP2073117 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - BICKLE J ET AL, "Software Radio Architecture (SRA) 2.0 Technical Overview", INTERNET ARTICLE, (200012), pages 1 - 45, URL: http://www.omg.org/docs/sdo/00-12-05.pdf, (20070815), XP002446983 [Y] 1-3,18,23-25,40 * page 3 * * pages 7-10 * * page 15 * * pages 29,30 * | [Y] - GEIB M, "Writing Easily Portable Code", ICALEPCS'95, INT. CONF. ON ACCELERATOR AND LARGE EXPERIMENTAL CONTROL SYSTEMS, Chicago, USA, (19951102), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://lumumba.uhasselt.be/~takis/docs/th1bd.pdf, (20070816), XP002446984 [Y] 1-3,18,23-25,40 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 3 * | [L] - ANONYMOUS, "ICALEPS,95 -- Schedule and Sessions", INTERNET ARTICLE, (19951003), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www-csr.bessy.de/control/Docs/icalepcs95/icalepcs_agenda.html, (20070816), XP002446985 [L] * the whole document * | [PA] - FRAMPTON S, "Codingstyle Interview with wxWindows Developers", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20020507), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20020507084359/http://codingstyle.com/modules.php?op=modload&name=News&file=article&sid=43, (20070815), XP002446986 [PA] 1-3,18,23-25,40 * page 3, paragraph 14 - page 4, paragraph 2 * | International search | [Y] - APPCO PROJECT 16 900 MHZ FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT COMMUNICATIONS, (2000), page 1, URL: http://www.apco911.org/institute/page1/apco16.htm, XP002960061 | [Y] - ORFALI ROBERT ET AL., Client server programming with JAVA and CORBA, (19970130), XP002960062 [Y] * Second Edition, pages 1-60, 331-371, 433-518, 711-830, 905-932 * | [Y] - FOWLER MARTIN, "UML distilled applying the standard object modeling language", (199705), pages 1 - 179, XP002941834 |