EP1423118 - METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNISEARCH LIMITED Rupert Myers Building, Level 2, Gate 14, Barker Street, UNSW Sydney, NSW 2052 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states UNISEARCH LIMITED Rupert Myers Building, Level 2, Gate 14, Barker Street, UNSW Sydney, NSW 2052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, David, Lawson 950 Forest Road Lugarno, New South Wales 2217 / AU | 02 /
POURGHOLAMI, Mohammad, Hossein 16/276 Bunnerong Road Hillsdale, New South Wales 2136 / AU | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02748440.1 | 16.07.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002AU00954 | Priority number, date | AU2001PR06443 | 17.07.2001 Original published format: AU PR644301 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03007957 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423118 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/498, A61K47/44, A61P35/04 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
A61K47/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2004/23] | English: | METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2004/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET PREPARATION DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 18.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]ZA928419 ; | [Y]GB1081551 (MICHEL MARIE ANDRE GUERBET) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4578391 (KAWATA HIROITSU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0193936 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * column 7, line 62 - line 68 * * column 8 * * column 9, line 6 - line 7 * * column 13, line 38 - line 68 * * column 14, line 1 - line 24 *; | [Y]EP0676201 (ADCOCK INGRAM PHARMA [ZA]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO9956697 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU], et al) [YD] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0017212 (JOMAA HASSAN [DE]) [X] 16-19 * page 14, paragraphs 3,4,8,9 * * page 15, line 25 * * page 16, paragraph 4 * [Y] 10-13,15; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 28, Database accession no. 1994-235028, XP002364923 & ZA9208419 A 19940525 (UNIV PRETORIA) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * | [Y] - O'REILLY J R ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF MIXED MICELLAR SYSTEMS, BILE SALT/FATTY ACIDS, ON THE SOLUBILITY AND INTESTINAL ABSORPTION OF CLOFAZIMINE (B663) IN THE ANAESTHETISED RAT", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1994), vol. 109, no. 2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 147 - 154, XP008058446 [Y] 16-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(94)90142-2 | [Y] - KONNO T, "TARGETING CHEMOTHERAPY FOR HEPATOMA: ARTERIAL ADMINISTRATION OF ANTICANCER DRUGS INVOLVED IN LIPIODOL", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (1992), vol. 28, no. 2/3, ISSN 0959-8049, pages 403 - 409, XP008058468 [Y] 1-14,16-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(05)80063-2 | [Y] - KONNO T ET AL, "TARGETED CHEMOTHERAPY FOR UNRESECTABLE PRIMARY AND METASTATIC LIVER CANCER", ACTA ONCOLOGICA, XX, XX, (1994), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 133 - 137, XP008058449 [Y] 1-14,16-20 * the whole document * | [Y] - MATHUR A ET AL, "EFFECT OF DIETARY FAT ON TISSUE DISPOSITION OF CLOFAZIMINE IN MICE RECEIVING THE DRUG ORALLY AS SUSPENSION IN OILS", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, XX, XX, (1997), vol. 29, no. 4, ISSN 0253-7613, pages 262 - 265, XP008058453 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document, especially page 58 left column 3.3.1 ; page 60 3.3.3 ; page 63 Table 2 ; Figure 3 curves PLC * | [A] - VAN RENSBURG C E ET AL, "Riminophenazine compounds: pharmacology and anti-neoplastic potential.", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN ONCOLOGY/HEMATOLOGY. JAN 1997, (199701), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 1040-8428, pages 55 - 67, XP002364921 [A] 16-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1040-8428(96)00229-6 | International search | [X] - RUFF P. ET AL., "A phase II study of oral clofazimine in unresectable and metastatic hepatocellular carcinoma", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY, (199802), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 217 - 219, XP002997317 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008204911774 | [X] - VAN RENSBURG C.E.J. ET AL., "The riminophenazine agents clofazimine and B669 inhibit the proliferation of cancer cell lines in vitro by phospholipase A2-mediated oxidative and non-oxidative mechanisms", CANCER RESEARCH, (199301), vol. 53, pages 318 - 323, XP002997346 | [X] - VAN NIEKERK E. ET AL., "Tetramethylpiperidine-substitued phenazines inhibit the proliferation of intrinsically multidrug resistant carcinoma cell lines", INVESTIGATIONAL NEW DRUGS, (200108), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 211 - 217, XP002997318 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1010691714635 | [X] - SRITHARAN M., "Studies on the tissues distribution of liposome-associated clofazimine, an antileprosy drug", METH. FIND. EXP. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (199303), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 107 - 111, XP002997347 | [X] - PATEL V.B. ET AL., "A topical dosage form of liposomal clofazimine: research and clinical implications", PHARMAZIE, (199906), vol. 54, no. 6, pages 448 - 451, XP000828549 | [X] - HOLDINESS M.R., "Clinical pharmacokinetics of clofazimine. A review", CLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS, (1989), vol. 16, pages 74 - 85, XP002997348 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 28, Database accession no. 1994-235028, XP002997319 & ZA9208419 A 19940525 (UNIV. PRETORIA) |