EP1393150 - COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH Domagkstrasse 28 80807 München / DE | [2004/17] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMID, Michael Schulstr. 13 89407 Dillingen / DE | 02 /
SCHERER, August Bühlweg 5 86424 Dinkelscherben / DE | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02748558.0 | 28.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002DE01965 | Priority number, date | DE2001127335 | 06.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127335 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099611 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1393150 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1393150 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/18 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G06F1/184 (EP,US);
G06F1/181 (EP,US);
G06F1/187 (EP,US);
Y10T292/0934 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/03] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTER | [2004/10] | English: | COMPUTER | [2004/10] | French: | ORDINATEUR | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 18.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.01.2010 | DK | 20.01.2010 | FI | 20.01.2010 | IE | 20.01.2010 | IT | 20.01.2010 | NL | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | AT | 28.05.2010 | LU | 28.05.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
AT | 28.05.2010 | ||
LU | 28.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
AT | 28.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 20.01.2010 | |
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 20.01.2010 | |
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | NL | 20.01.2010 | |
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | ES | 01.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2190793 (MITAC INC) [A] 1,2,6* abstract *; | [A]DE9211360U (CHEN) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Detachable Plate for Mounting Electromechanical Devices, Lock and Indicator and Bezel Assemblies", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (19870301), vol. 29, no. 10, pages 4351 - 4358, XP001092747 [A] 1,2,6 * page 4351, line 1 - page 4354, line 6; figures 1,2 * |