EP1409239 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SURFACE ELEMENT, AND SURFACE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innocoating Oy Nallekuja 5 01900 Nurmijärvi / FI | [2008/50] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Tikka-System OY Maalaiskunnantie 15 28760 Pori / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIKKA, Raimo Maalaiskunnantie 15 FIN-28760 Pori / FI | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2004/17] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 02748897.2 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002FI00589 | Priority number, date | FI20010001423 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: FI 20011423 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03002336 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409239 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409239 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/22, B32B15/08 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
B32B3/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTLELUNG EINES OBERFLÄCHENELEMENTS UND OBERFLÄCHENELEMENT | [2004/17] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SURFACE ELEMENT, AND SURFACE ELEMENT | [2004/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ELEMENTS DE SURFACE ET ELEMENT DE SURFACE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 27.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 03.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.12.2008 | BE | 24.12.2008 | CY | 24.12.2008 | CZ | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | NL | 24.12.2008 | SK | 24.12.2008 | TR | 24.12.2008 | BG | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | GB | 01.07.2009 | IE | 01.07.2009 | LU | 01.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LU | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
NL | 24.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS57151422 ; | [X]US4451518 (MIURA TOSHIKATU [JP], et al); | [X]US4569880 (NISHIYAMA YUKIO [JP], et al); | [A]FI89143B (TIKKA RAIMO [FI]); | [X]EP1092818 (ALSTOM LHB GMBH [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821215), vol. 6, no. 256, Database accession no. (M - 179), & JP57151422 A 19820918 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) |