EP1392834 - LIPOXYGENASE OVEREXPRESSION IN PLANTS AND REDUCTION IN PLANT SENSITIVITY TO DISEASES AND ATTACKS FROM PATHOGENIC ORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogemma 1, rue Edouard Colonne 75001 Paris / FR | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Rhobio 14-20, rue Pierre Baizet 69009 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENE-SAFFRANE, Laurent Lotissement Tembous F-64680 Ogeu-Les-Bains / FR | 02 /
ESQUERRE-TUGAYE, Marie-Thérèse 11, rue du Chateau d'Eau F-31320 Castanet-Tolosan / FR | 03 /
FOURNIER, Jo[lle 54, rue de Capèle d'Ox F-31600 Muret / FR | 04 /
BEFFA, Roland 41, allée Antonin Dumas F-69230 St. Genis Laval / FR | 05 /
GROSJEAN-COURNOYER, Marie-Claire Le Trève Collonge Route d'Albigny F-69250 Curis Au Mont D'Or / FR | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Flesselles, Bruno F.G. Biogemma 5,rue Saint-Germain l'Auxerrois 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Flesselles, Bruno F.G. Biogemma 5,rue Saint-Germain l'Auxerrois 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02748941.8 | 06.06.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002FR01943 | Priority number, date | FR20010007470 | 07.06.2001 Original published format: FR 0107470 | FR20010014358 | 07.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114358 | [2004/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02099112 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392834 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01N65/00, A01H5/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
C12N15/8282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBEREXPRESSION EINER LIPOXYGENASE IN PFLANZEN UND VERMINDERUNG DER EMPFÄNGLICHLICHKEIT VON PFLANZEN GEGENÜBER PATHOGENBEFALL | [2004/10] | English: | LIPOXYGENASE OVEREXPRESSION IN PLANTS AND REDUCTION IN PLANT SENSITIVITY TO DISEASES AND ATTACKS FROM PATHOGENIC ORGANISMS | [2004/10] | French: | SUR-EXPRESSION D'UNE LIPOXYGENASE DANS LES PLANTES ET DIMINUTION DE LA SENSIBILITE DES PLANTES AUX MALADIES ET AUX AGRESSIONS PAR DES ORGANISMES PATHOGENES | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 17.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/46] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0494687 ; | [X]WO9713851 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 12-18 * figures 2,4; examples 1-8 *; | [X]WO9726364 (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-12,15-18 * page 4, line 20 - line 23 * * page 6, line 3 - line 4 * * page 6, line 10 - line 30; example 2 *; | [X]FR2777423 (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-5,11 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 1, line 20 - line 23 * * page 3, line 24 - line 28 * * page 11, line 12 - line 29 * * page 19, line 5 - line 15 * * page 20, line 28 - page 21, line 2 * * page 21, line 23 - line 28; figures 2,7; claim 14 *; | [A]WO0050575 (CALGENE LLC [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0136464 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [XY] - VERONESI C ET AL, "Lypoxygenase gene expression in the tobacco-Phytophtora parasitica nicotianae interaction", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (1996), vol. 112, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 997 - 1004, XP002166122 [X] 1-7,11 * page 1003, column L, paragraph L; figures 3-5 * [Y] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.112.3.997 | [XY] - RANCE IANN ET AL, "The incompatible interaction between Phytophthora parasitica var. nicotianae race 0 and tobacco is suppressed in transgenic plants expressing antisense lipoxygenase sequences", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19980526), vol. 95, no. 11, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6554 - 6559, XP002165964 [X] 12-18 * the whole document * [Y] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.11.6554 | [X] - RANCE IANN, "Thèse de doctorat: Isolement d'un gene lipoxygenase chez le tabac et recherche par la strategie antisens de son implication lors de l'interaction avec Phytophtora parasitica nicotianae", PASCAL NO.: 98-0197554, XP002166053 [X] 12-14 * the whole document * | [X] - BEAUDOIN NATHALIE ET AL, "Developmental regulation of two tomato lipoxygenase promoters in transgenic tobacco and tomato", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, NIJHOFF PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (1997), vol. 33, no. 5, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 835 - 846, XP002165965 [X] 12-14,16-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005773722657 | [ ] - "Lycopersicon esculentum lipoxygenase tomloxA (tomloxA) gene, promoter region, partial cds", EMBL, (19960816), Database accession no. U63117, XP002237890 [ ] * cDNA in GenBank Accession Number U09026 * | [A] - PLANT GENE REGISTER PGR95-009. VERONESI,C., FOURNIER,J., RICKAUER,M., MAROLDA,M. AND ESQUERRE-TUGAYE,M.-T. (1995) NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF AN ELICITOR-INDUCED TOBACCO LIPOXYGENASE CDNA (GENBANK X84040) (PGR95-009). PLANT PHYSIOL 108: 1342, XP002193021 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [ ] - "N.tabacum mRNA for lipoxygenase", EMBL, (19950711), XP002193024 [ ] * the whole document * | [A] - FERRIE BONITA J ET AL, "The cloning of two tomato lipoxygenase genes and their differential expression during fruit ripening.", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (ROCKVILLE), (1994), vol. 106, no. 1, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 109 - 118, XP002237888 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.106.1.109 | [ ] - "Lycopersicon esculentum lipoxygenase (loxA) mRNA, complete cds", EMBL, (20000405), Database accession no. U09026, XP002237891 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - FOURNIER, J., ET AL., "Purification and characterization of elicitor-induced lipoxygenase in tobacco cells", THE PLANT JOURNAL, (1993), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 63 - 70, XP002237889 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - RUSTERUCCI CHRISTINE ET AL, "Involvement of lipoxygenase-dependent production of fatty acid hydroperoxides in the development of the hypersensitive cell death induced by cryptogein on tobacco leaves.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19991217), vol. 274, no. 51, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 36446 - 36455, XP002193022 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.51.36446 | [A] - HAUSE BETTINA ET AL, "Expression of cucumber lipid-body lipoxygenase in transgenic tobacco: Lipid-body lipoxygenase is correctly targeted to seed lipid bodies.", PLANTA (BERLIN), (200004), vol. 210, no. 5, ISSN 0032-0935, pages 708 - 714, XP002193023 [A] 12-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004250050671 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 19, Database accession no. 1992-156057, XP002193025 & JPH0494687 A 19920326 (MITSUI GYOSAI SHOKU) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |