EP1419238 - NOVEL CONSTITUTIVE AND TISSUE SPECIFIC PLANT PROMOTERS AND THEIR UTILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agricultural Research Organization Volcani Center, P.O. Box 6 50250 Beit Dagan / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Agricultural Research Organization Volcani Center, P.O. Box 6 50250 Beit Dagan / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPULNIK, Yoram 52 Hayasmin Street 99 979 Karmey Yosef / IL | 02 /
KAHANA, Anat 7 Irit Street 48 580 Rosh Ha'ain / IL | 03 /
BAR-AKIVA, Ayelet 29 Gizo Shimshon 99 745 Gizo / IL | 04 /
BEN-DOV, Rozalia 10 Nahal oz Street 69 184 Tel Aviv / IL | 05 /
WININGER, Smadar 44 Jerusalem Street 75 325 Rishon LeZion / IL | 06 /
GINZBERG, Idit 26 Rambam Street 43 602 Raanana / IL | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 02749273.5 | 18.07.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002IL00599 | Priority number, date | US20010308581P | 31.07.2001 Original published format: US 308581 P | US20010983183 | 23.10.2001 Original published format: US 983183 | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03011014 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1419238 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/04, C12N15/09, C12N15/29, C12N15/52, C12N15/63, C12N15/65, C12N15/66, C12N15/67, C12N15/82, C12N15/90, A01H5/00, A01H5/10 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/8233 (EP,US);
C12N15/8216 (EP,US);
C12N15/8225 (EP,US);
C12N15/8227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE KONSTITUTIVE, GEWEBESPEZIFISCHE PFLANZENPROMOTER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2004/21] | English: | NOVEL CONSTITUTIVE AND TISSUE SPECIFIC PLANT PROMOTERS AND THEIR UTILIZATION | [2004/21] | French: | NOUVEAUX PROMOTEURS DE PLANTES SPECIFIQUES DE TISSUS ET CONSTITUTIFS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CA2165018 (CA MINISTER AGRICULTURE & FOOD [CA], et al); | [X]US5859335 (PATTON DAVID ANDREW [US]); | [Y] - SUTER-CRAZZOLARA ET AL., "Reporter genes", METH. CELL BIOL., (1995), vol. 50, pages 425 - 438, XP002967144 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-679X(08)61048-1 | [X] - GAULY ET AL., "Isolation and characterization of a gene encoding a Chlorphyll a/b-binding protein from mustard and the targeting of the encoded protein to the Thylakoid membrane of Pea chloroplasts in vivo", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 19, pages 277 - 287, XP002967145 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00027349 | [X] - KREBBERS ET AL., "Four genes in two diverged subfamilies encode the ribulose-1,5-bisphosphate carboxylase small subunit polypeptides of arabidopsis thaliana", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 11, pages 745 - 759, XP002967146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00019515 | [X] - WEAVER ET AL., "Characterization of the cDNA and gene coding for the biotin synthase of arabidopsis thaliana", PLANT PHYSIOL., (1996), vol. 110, pages 1021 - 1028, XP002967147 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.110.3.1021 |