EP1404829 - NOVEL AMINOPEPTIDASE DERIVED FROM BACILLUS LICHENIFORMIS, GENE ENCODING THE AMINOPEPTIDASE, EXPRESSION VECTOR CONTAINING THE GENE, TRANSFORMANT AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Life Sciences Ltd. 20, Yeoido-dong, Youngdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2007/50] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states LG Life Sciences Ltd. 20, Yeoido-dong, Youngdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Young-Phil, 381-42 LG Company House 6-401 Doryong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seung-won, 206-1804 Hanshin Apt. 124, Imae-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si 463-906 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Chul-ho, 308-1306 Chungsol Apt. 8-2, Songgang-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-503 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hyung-Cheol, 704-1203 7-danji Yeolmae-maul 919, Jijok-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-330 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Soon-Yong 106-801 Nuri Apt., Wolpyeong-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-280 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Jin-suk 180-12, Yucheon 2-dong, Jung-gu Daejeon 301-142 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Hyun-Sik 8-503 LG Apt. Doryong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 08 /
SEO, Jung-Woo 3-601 Kukdong Apt., Garak 2-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul 138-162 / KR | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02749387.3 | 06.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002KR01280 | Priority number, date | KR20010040268 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: KR 2001040268 | KR20020030798 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: KR 2002030798 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004635 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404829 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404829 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/56, C12N15/57, C12N15/63, C12N1/20 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
C12N9/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] |
Former [2004/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | 18.12.2003 | LT | 18.12.2003 | LV | 18.12.2003 | MK | 18.12.2003 | RO | 18.12.2003 | SI | 18.12.2003 | Title | German: | NEUE, AUS BACILLUS LICHENIFORMIS STAMMENDE AMINOPEPTIDASE, DIE AMINOPEPTIDASE CODIERENDES GEN, DAS GEN ENTHALTENDER EXPRESSIONSVEKTOR, TRANSFORMANT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2004/15] | English: | NOVEL AMINOPEPTIDASE DERIVED FROM BACILLUS LICHENIFORMIS, GENE ENCODING THE AMINOPEPTIDASE, EXPRESSION VECTOR CONTAINING THE GENE, TRANSFORMANT AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF | [2004/15] | French: | AMINOPEPTIDASE DERIVEE DU BACILLUS LICHENIFORMIS, GENE CODANT LADITE AMINOPEPTIDASE, VECTEUR D'EXPRESSION CONTENANT LEDIT GENE, TRANSFORMANT ET METHODE DE PREPARATION ASSOCIEE | [2004/15] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.12.2007 | CZ | 12.12.2007 | EE | 12.12.2007 | SK | 12.12.2007 | [2009/34] |
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 12.12.2007 | |
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 12.12.2007 | |
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 12.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9838290 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [T]US6428997 (LEE YOUNG-PHIL [KR], et al) [T] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X] - RODRIGUEZ-ABSI J ET AL, "ISOLATION AND PROPERTIES OF AN AMINOPEPTIDASE FROM BACILLUS LICHENIFORMIS", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, NEW YORK, US, US, (197803), vol. 186, no. 2, ISSN 0003-9861, pages 383 - 391, XP009003094 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(78)90449-6 | [PX] - KIM JIN SOOK ET AL, "Cloning and expression of the aminopeptidase gene from the Bacillus licheniformis in Bacillus subtilis.", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200210), vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 1017-7825, pages 773 - 779, XP009045946 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO9838290 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al); | [XP] - GENBANK, (20011011), Database accession no. (AF358651), XP002986654 |