EP1377356 - PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING PARTICLES COATED WITH ACTIVATED LIGNOSULFONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helen of Troy Limited 13 8th Avenue Belleville, P.O. Box 836E St. Michael / BB | [2012/42] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, Michael, Donovan 3326 Celedon Court Cincinnati, OH 45251 / US | 02 /
OWENS, Blair, Alex 1106 Village Crossing Drive Chapel Hill NC 27517 / US | 03 /
COLLIAS, Dimitris, Iaonnis 4683 Cedar Village Drive Mason, OH 45040 / US | 04 /
WNUK, Andrew, Julian 450 Hidden Valley Lane Wyoming, OH 45215 / US | [2004/10] |
Former [2004/02] | 01 /
MITCHELL, Michael, Donovan 3326 Celedon Court Cincinnati, OH 45251 / US | ||
02 /
OWENS, Blair, Alex 8894C Harperspoint Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | |||
03 /
COLLIAS, Dimitris, Iaonnis 4683 Cedar Village Drive Mason, OH 45040 / US | |||
04 /
WNUK, Andrew, Julian 450 Hidden Valley Lane Wyoming, OH 45215 / US | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/03] | Niemann, Frédéric, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/02] | Niemann, Frédéric, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/38] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2004/02] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02749521.7 | 11.04.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002US11627 | Priority number, date | US20010832581 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: US 832581 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02098536 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1377356 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377356 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, B01J20/32 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
B01J20/3293 (EP,US);
B01D39/00 (KR);
B01D39/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/28023 (EP,US);
B01J20/28057 (EP,US);
B01J20/28069 (EP,US);
B01J20/28083 (EP,US);
B01J20/28085 (EP,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,US);
B01J20/324 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
B01J2220/4812 (EP,US);
B01J2220/4837 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PARTIKELN, BESCHICHTET MIT AKTIVIERTEM LIGNOSULFONAT | [2004/02] | English: | PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING PARTICLES COATED WITH ACTIVATED LIGNOSULFONATE | [2004/02] | French: | PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE PARTICULES ENROBEES DE LIGNOSULFONATE ACTIVE | [2004/02] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 31.03.2008 | Appeal received No. T1486/08 | 06.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.07.2011 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2011/30] | 16.11.2011 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2011/47] | 23.02.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2013 | BE | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | NL | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | ES | 19.08.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 09.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0549921 ; | [X]JP2000325783 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 14, Database accession no. 1993-112084, XP002214974 & JPH0549921 A 19930302 (TOKAI CARBON KK) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000325783 A 20001128 (TAIKI:KKMITSUI MINING) [X] 1 * abstract * |