EP1423842 - AN INTERNET INTERFACE & INTEGRATION LANGUAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cokinetics Systems 41 West Putnam Avenue Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVENS, Kris 24 Vanberburgh Larchmont, NY 10538 / US | 02 /
SHULMAN, David, J. 110-20 71st Avenue, Apt. 701 Forest Hills, NY 11375 / US | 03 /
LENNON, Kevin, J. 3 New York Avenue White Plains, NY 10666 / US | 04 /
BARESICH, Michael 202 Mansfield Avenue Darien, CT 06820 / US | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Lenne, Laurence, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Lenne, Laurence, et al Cabinet Feray Lenne Conseil 44/52, rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02749710.6 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002US20662 | Priority number, date | US20010302108P | 30.06.2001 Original published format: US 302108 P | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03005337 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1423842 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/23] | G09G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | 29.01.2004 | LT | 29.01.2004 | LV | 29.01.2004 | MK | 29.01.2004 | RO | 29.01.2004 | SI | 29.01.2004 | Title | German: | INTERNET-SCHNITTSTELLE UND INTEGRATIONSSPRACHENSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2004/23] | English: | AN INTERNET INTERFACE & INTEGRATION LANGUAGE SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2004/23] | French: | INTERFACE INTERNET ET SYSTEME DE LANGAGE D'INTEGRATION, ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 26.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/13] | Divisional application(s) | EP10183155.0 / EP2375320 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2007 | 31.07.2010 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ABRAMS M ET AL, "UIML: An Appliance-Independent XML User Interface Language", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, (19990511), pages 1 - 14, XP002163485 [X] 1-33 * abstract * * page 6, line 45 - page 9, line 49 * * page 11, lines 23-25 * * page 12, lines 38-40 * | [X] - ABRAMS M, "User Interface Markup Language (UIML) Draft Specification - Language Version 2.0a", INTERNET CITATION, (20000117), URL: http://www.uiml.org/specs/docs/uiml20-17Jan00.pdf, (20030107), XP002226392 [X] 1-33 * pages 4,5 * * page 9 * * page 15 * | International search | [X]US5844554 (GELLER SCOTT D [US], et al); | [X]US5870719 (MARITZEN L M [US], et al); | [X]US6012044 (MAGGIONCALDA JEFF N [US], et al); | [X]US6167383 (HENSON KEN [US]) |