EP1405382 - ELECTRIC CIRCUIT PROVIDING SELECTABLE SHORT CIRCUIT FOR INSTRUMENTATION APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ideal Industries Inc. Becker Place Sycamore, IL 60178 / US | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Charles, Michael 2348 North Iris Lane Escondido, CA 92026 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Barry, James 1355 Woodview Court Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Spencer, Michael David, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Spencer, Michael David, Dr., et al Bromhead & Co., 37 Great James Street London WC1N 3HB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02749747.8 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US20918 | Priority number, date | US20010896421 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 896421 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03003536 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405382 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/00, H04B3/46 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
G01R31/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | H02H3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES WÄHLBAREN KURZSCHLUSSES FÜR INSTRUMENTATIONSANWENDUNGEN | [2004/15] | English: | ELECTRIC CIRCUIT PROVIDING SELECTABLE SHORT CIRCUIT FOR INSTRUMENTATION APPLICATIONS | [2004/15] | French: | CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE PERMETTANT DES COURTS-CIRCUITS SELECTIONNABLES POUR APPLICATIONS D'INSTRUMENTATION | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 06.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4542032 (MILLER ALEX E [US]) [A] 1-45 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5629628 (HINDS MARK E [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * column 3, line 6 - line 49 *; | [A]US6051968 (SHIM WEON SEOB [KR], et al) [A] 1-45* figure 3 *; | [A]US6087835 (HANEDA MASAJI [JP]) [A] 1-45 * column 2, line 3 - line 52 * | International search | [A]US4542302 (GRIFFIOEN G [NL]); | [A]US6051968 (SHIM WEON SEOB [KR], et al) | by applicant | US6087835 | US5629628 | US6051968 |