EP1406944 - TEMPORARILY CROSSLINKED POLYESTER POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 4417 Lancaster Pike Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | ||
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 4417 Lancaster Pike Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUAN, Jiwen, F. 207 Gingergate Drive Cary, NC 27519 / US | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02750122.0 | 17.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US22752 | Priority number, date | US20010907050 | 17.07.2001 Original published format: US 907050 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03008478 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406944 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/20, C08G63/68, C08L67/02 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
C08G63/914 (EP,US);
C08G63/91 (KR);
C08G63/6954 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORÜBERGEHEND VERNETZTE POLYESTER | [2004/16] | English: | TEMPORARILY CROSSLINKED POLYESTER POLYMERS | [2004/16] | French: | POLYMERES DE POLYESTER PROVISOIREMENT RETICULES | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 03.08.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3335211 (MEAD EDWARD J, et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-13,19-22 * example 3; claim 1; table II * * column 1, line 14 - line 16 * * column 3, line 2 - line 23 * * column 4, line 15 - line 64 *; | [A]US3406152 (WALTER KOLLER) [A] 1-22* abstract *; | [X]EP0543298 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-13,19-22 * abstract * * page 4, line 5 - line 28 * * page 6, line 5 - line 12 *; | [X]EP0545108 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-12,19-22 * abstract * * page 7 - page 9 *; | [X]US5478909 (JEHL DENIS [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-12,19-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - line 51 * |