EP1549760 - SAK: MODULATION OF CELLULAR PROLIFERATION FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 240 E. Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMO, Susan 999 Pocatello Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
HITOSHI, Yasumichi 331 Callippe Court Brisbane, CA 94005 / US | 03 /
JENKINS, Yonchu 1279 Page Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02750377.0 | 31.07.2002 | [2005/27] | WO2002US24312 | Priority number, date | US20010309632P | 01.08.2001 Original published format: US 309632 P | US20010026021 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 26021 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03012055 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1549760 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549760 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/48, G01N33/53, A61K39/395, A61K48/00 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/912 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/48, G01N33/53, A61K39/395, A61K48/00, A61K7/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | 01.03.2004 | LT | 01.03.2004 | LV | 01.03.2004 | MK | 01.03.2004 | RO | 01.03.2004 | SI | 01.03.2004 | Title | German: | SAK: MODULATION DER ZELLPROLIFERATION ZUR KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2005/27] | English: | SAK: MODULATION OF CELLULAR PROLIFERATION FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2005/27] | French: | PROTEINE KINASE SAK: MODULATION DE LA PROLIFERATION CELLULAIRE DESTINEE AU TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 21.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | CZ | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | SK | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | IE | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | LU | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
IE | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
LU | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
IE | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
IE | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SK | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CZ | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | EE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HUDSON J W ET AL, "Late mitotic failure in mice lacking Sak, a polo-like kinase", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (20010320), vol. 11, no. 6, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 441 - 446, XP002369281 [X] 9-50 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(01)00117-8 | [X] - FODE CAROL ET AL, "Constitutive expression of murine Sak-a suppresses cell growth and induces multinucleation", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 16, no. 9, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 4665 - 4672, XP002369282 [X] 9-50 * the whole document * | [A] - HUDSON JOHN W ET AL, "Sak kinase gene structure and transcriptional regulation", GENE (AMSTERDAM), (20000104), vol. 241, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 65 - 73, XP002369283 [A] 1-50 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(99)00467-9 | [A] - KARN THOMAS ET AL, "Human SAK related to the PLK/polo family of cell cycle kinases shows high mRNA expression in testis", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (1997), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 505 - 510, XP008060542 [A] 1-50 * the whole document * | [A] - HIRAO A ET AL, "DNA DAMAGE-INDUCED ACTIVATION OF P53 BY THE CHECKPOINT KINASE CHK2", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (20000310), vol. 287, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1824 - 1827, XP002945471 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.287.5459.1824 | [A] - LUKAS CLAUDIA ET AL, "DNA damage-activated kinase Chk2 is independent of proliferation or differentiation yet correlates with tissue biology", CANCER RESEARCH, (20010701), vol. 61, no. 13, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4990 - 4993, XP002369284 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [PX] - MACMILLAN J C ET AL, "Comparative expression of the mitotic regulators SAK and PLK in colorectal cancer.", ANNALS OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY : THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY. OCT 2001, (200110), vol. 8, no. 9, ISSN 1068-9265, pages 729 - 740, XP002369285 [PX] 9-50 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5976893 (DENNIS JAMES W [CA], et al); | [A]US6569662 (TANG Y TOM [US], et al); | [X] - FODE ET AL., "Sak, a murine proteine-serine/threonine kinase that is related to the Drosophila polo kinase and involved in cell proliferation", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, USA, (199407), vol. 91, pages 6388 - 6392, XP002984335 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.14.6388 | by applicant | US4816567 | US5010175 | WO9119735 | WO9200091 | WO9320242 | US5288514 | US5539083 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - PRESTA, CURR OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - FURKA, INT. J. PEPT. PROT. RES., (1991), vol. 37, pages 487 - 493 | - HOUGHTON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 84 - 88 | - HOBBS ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6909 - 6913 | - HAGIHARA ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 114, page 6568 | - HIRSCHMANN ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 114, pages 9217 - 9218 | - CHEN ET AL., J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 116, page 2661 | - CHO, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1303 | - CAMPBELL ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1994), vol. 59, page 658 | - VAUGHN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 309 - 314 | - MERRIFIELD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2154 | - GEYSEN ET AL., J IMMUN. METH., (1987), vol. 102, pages 259 - 274 | - FRANK; DORING, TETRAHEDRON, (1988), vol. 44, pages 6031 - 6040 | - FODOR ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, pages 767 - 777 | - SHELDON ET AL., CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 718 - 719 | - KOZAL ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 2, no. 7, pages 753 - 759 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - ANDERSON, SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813 | - NABEL; FELGNER, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 211 - 217 | - MITANI; CASKEY, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 162 - 166 | - MULLIGAN, SCIENCE, (1993), pages 926 - 932 | - DILLON, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 167 - 175 | - MILLER, NATURE, (1992), vol. 357, pages 455 - 460 | - VAN BRUNT, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1149 - 1154 | - VIGNE, RESTORATIVE NEUROLOGY AND NEUROSCIENCE, (1995), vol. 8, pages 35 - 36 | - KREMER; PERRICAUDET, BRITISH MEDICAL BULLETIN, (1995), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 31 - 44 | - HADDADA ET AL., CURRENT TOPICS |