EP1377338 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MICRONEEDLE STRUCTURES USING SOFT LITHOGRAPHY AND PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corium International, Inc. 2686 Middlefield Road, Suite G Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2005/44] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARIAS, Francisco 1440 W. Kemper Road 1506 Cincinnati, OH 45240 / US | 02 /
SHERMAN, Faiz, Feisal 8517 Breezewood Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 03 /
OWENS, Grover, David 1612 Oak Valley Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2007/38] | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D. Young & Co. 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2004/14] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 92/94 66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | ||
Former [2004/02] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 02750607.0 | 13.03.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002US07543 | Priority number, date | US20010808534 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: US 808534 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02072189 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1377338 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377338 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1377338 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
A61M37/0015 (EP,US);
A61B5/1411 (US);
A61B5/14514 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150282 (EP,US);
A61B5/150419 (EP,US);
A61B5/150984 (EP,US);
B81C1/00111 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0038 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIKRONADELSTRUKTUREN MIT SANFTER LITHOGRAPHIE UND PHOTOLITHOGRAPHIE | [2004/02] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING MICRONEEDLE STRUCTURES USING SOFT LITHOGRAPHY AND PHOTOLITHOGRAPHY | [2004/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE STRUCTURES DE MICROAIGUILLES AU MOYEN DE LA LITHOGRAPHIE DOUCE ET DE LA PHOTOLITHOGRAPHIE | [2004/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Request for further processing for: | 04.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2008 | BE | 06.08.2008 | CY | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | NL | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | IE | 13.03.2009 | LU | 13.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 13.03.2009 | ||
LU | 13.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 13.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 13.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 13.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9637256 (SILICON MICRODEVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,9,18,23,28 * abstract ** page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 3; figure 6 *; | [X]WO0005166 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) [X] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [X]US6106751 (TALBOT NEIL H [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0074763 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US]) [X] 1-34 * page 36, line 14 - page 45, line 28 *; | [X]US6187210 (LEBOUITZ KYLE S [US], et al) [X] 35-38 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 26; figure 1 * | Examination | WO0070406 | - PROF. G.M. WHITESIDES, DR. Y. XIA, Soft lithography, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ,37,550-575, WILEY-VCH VERLAG GMBH, D-69451 WEINHEIM, (1998), XP000985399 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3773(19980316)37:5<550::AID-ANIE550>3.0.CO;2-G | by applicant | US3964482 | WO9637256 | WO9748440 | WO9748441 | WO9748442 | WO9800193 |