EP1402543 - MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MAKING AN ELECTROCONDUCTIVE PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2006/48] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert Corporate IP Department 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMOTTE, Johan, c/o Agfa-Gevaert Corporate IP Department 3800, Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [2004/14] | Application number, filing date | 02751043.7 | 18.06.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002EP06744 | Priority number, date | EP20010202423 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01202423 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03001537 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1402543 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402543 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/12 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
H01B1/127 (EP);
G03F7/021 (KR);
C08G61/126 (EP);
H05K3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/48] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTROLEITFÄHIGEN STRUKTUR | [2004/14] | English: | MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MAKING AN ELECTROCONDUCTIVE PATTERN | [2004/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET MATERIAU POUR PRODUIRE UN MODELE ELECTROCONDUCTEUR | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 25.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1079397 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1-9 * example .; claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO0120691 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 9, line 1 - line 7; figure 2; claims 1,2,5,6,9 *; | [DA]US5427841 (MUTSAERS CORNELIUS MARCUS J [NL], et al) [DA] 1-9 * column 6, line 1 - line 32; claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0686662 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * example 1 * | [A] - BARGON J ET AL, "LASER PROCESSING OF ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING POLYMERS INTO PATTERNS", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19930301), vol. 20, no. 1 / 2, ISSN 0167-9317, pages 55 - 72, XP000356096 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-9317(93)90207-L |