EP1414642 - HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A DOUBLE WALL FROM COPPER AND TITANIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/19] | FLAT METAL PRODUCT, ESPECIALLY FOR USE AS WALL FOR A HEAT EXCHANGER, AND HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A DOUBLE WALL FROM COPPER AND TITANIUM | ||
[2005/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Titan GmbH Westendstrasse 15 45143 Essen / DE | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIBUM, Heinz Reulsbergweg 16 45257 Essen / DE | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Knauf, Rudolf COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Knauf, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02751125.2 | 10.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002EP07659 | Priority number, date | DE2001137933 | 07.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10137933 | DE2001143836 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10143836 | [2004/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03013847 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414642 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414642 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01, B32B15/02 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
C22C9/00 (EP,US);
B21C37/06 (EP,US);
B21C37/09 (EP,US);
B32B15/01 (EP,US);
C22C14/00 (EP,US);
F28F19/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT EINER DOPPELLAGIGEN WANDUNG AUS KUPFER UND TITAN | [2005/33] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A DOUBLE WALL FROM COPPER AND TITANIUM | [2005/33] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE DOTE D'UNE PAROI DOUBLE COUCHE EN CUIVRE ET EN TITANE | [2005/33] |
Former [2004/19] | FLACHPRODUKT AUS METALL, INSBESONDERE ALS WANDUNG FÜR WÄRMETAUSCHER SOWIE WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT EINER DOPPELLAGIGEN WANDUNG AUS KUPFER UND TITAN | ||
Former [2004/19] | FLAT METAL PRODUCT, ESPECIALLY FOR USE AS WALL FOR A HEAT EXCHANGER, AND HEAT EXCHANGER HAVING A DOUBLE WALL FROM COPPER AND TITANIUM | ||
Former [2004/19] | PRODUIT PLAT EN METAL, UTILISE NOTAMMENT EN TANT QUE PAROI D'ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE, ET ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE DOTE D'UNE PAROI DOUBLE COUCHE EN CUIVRE ET EN TITANE | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 15.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.01.2006 | CZ | 11.01.2006 | EE | 11.01.2006 | FI | 11.01.2006 | IE | 11.01.2006 | NL | 11.01.2006 | SK | 11.01.2006 | TR | 11.01.2006 | BG | 11.04.2006 | GR | 12.04.2006 | AT | 10.07.2006 | LU | 10.07.2006 | BE | 31.07.2006 | CH | 31.07.2006 | LI | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 11.01.2006 | |
EE | 11.01.2006 | ||
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
TR | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 10.07.2006 | ||
LU | 10.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 11.01.2006 | |
EE | 11.01.2006 | ||
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 10.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 10.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
AT | 10.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
IT | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SK | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
BG | 11.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 11.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63219555 ; | [A]JPS63317334 ; | [A]JPS61168797 ; | [A]JPH03189071 ; | [A]JPS611416 ; | [AD]GB2151744 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) [AD] 1-9 * claims 1,2 * * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 16 *; | [A]US4780374 (MIZUHARA HOWARD [US]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-7 ** column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 26 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890111), vol. 013, no. 011, Database accession no. (C - 558), & JP63219555 A 19880913 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890418), vol. 013, no. 161, Database accession no. (M - 815), & JP63317334 A 19881226 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861213), vol. 010, no. 375, Database accession no. (M - 545), & JP61168797 A 19860730 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911112), vol. 015, no. 443, Database accession no. (M - 1178), & JP03189071 A 19910819 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860524), vol. 010, no. 142, Database accession no. (M - 481), & JP61001416 A 19860107 (SUMITOMO KEIKINZOKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |