EP1472660 - LEARNING CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tentendigital Limited Manning House, 22 Carlisle Place London SW1P 1JA / GB | [2004/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARNEGIE, Andrew, James 30 Vincent Square London SW1P 2NW / GB | 02 /
VERRIOS, Dennis 39 Ashworth Mansions, Elgin Avenue London W9 1JP / GB | 03 /
BOWD, Kevin, Anthony 21 Tennyson Road London NW6 7RT / GB | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02751344.9 | 30.07.2002 | [2004/45] | WO2002GB03456 | Priority number, date | GB20010018555 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: GB 0118555 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03012762 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1472660 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09B7/00 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G09B5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LERNENDES INHALTSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2004/45] | English: | LEARNING CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2004/45] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION DE CONTENU D'APPRENTISSAGE | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 07.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |