EP1420688 - MACROMOLECULAR IMAGING AGENTS FOR LIVER IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES C/o National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Blvd., Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services c/o National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Blvd., Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRECHBIEL, Martin, W. 3404 Monarch Lane Annandale, VA 22003-1155 / US | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Hisataka 8-35, Kambara Nishinomiya 662-0021 / JP | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02752092.3 | 24.06.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002US20118 | Priority number, date | US20010300882P | 25.06.2001 Original published format: US 300882 P | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03001218 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1420688 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, A61K51/00 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
A61K49/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAKROMOLEKULARE ABBILDUNGSMITTEL FÜR DIE LEBERABBILDUNG | [2004/22] | English: | MACROMOLECULAR IMAGING AGENTS FOR LIVER IMAGING | [2004/22] | French: | AGENTS D'IMAGERIE MACROMOLECULAIRES POUR VISUALISATION DU FOIE | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 26.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/33] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KOBAYASHI, HISATAKA ET AL, "Evaluation of the in Vivo Biodistribution of Indium-111 and Yttrium-88 Labeled Dendrimer -1B4M-DTPA and Its Conjugation with Anti-Tac Monoclonal Antibody", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY , 10(1), 103-111 CODEN: BCCHES; ISSN: 1043-1802, (1999), XP002333890 [X] 1-30 * page 104, column 1, paragraph 3; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc980091d | [PX] - KOBAYASHI, HISATAKA ET AL, "Dynamic micro-magnetic resonance imaging of liver micrometastasis in mice with a novel liver macromolecular magnetic resonance contrast agent DAB -Am64-(1B4M-Gd)64", CANCER RESEARCH , 61(13), 4966-4970 CODEN: CNREA8; ISSN: 0008-5472, (2001), XP002333891 [PX] 1-30 * abstract * | [PX] - KOBAYASHI, HISATAKA ET AL, "Novel liver macromolecular MR contrast agent with a polypropylenimine diaminobutyl dendrimer core: Comparison to the vascular MR contrast agent with the polyamidoamine dendrimer core", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE , 46(4), 795-802 CODEN: MRMEEN; ISSN: 0740-3194, (2001), XP002333893 [PX] 1-30 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.1259 | International search | [Y]US5560929 (HEDSTRAND DAVID M [US], et al); | [X]US5714166 (TOMALIA DONALD A [US], et al); | [Y]US6045776 (PLATZEK JOHANNES [DE], et al) |