EP1449005 - DETERMINING LOCATION INFORMATION FROM SAMPLED POSITIONING SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SiRF Technology, Inc. 217 Devcon Drive San Jose, CA 95112 / US | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states SiRF Technology, Inc. 148 East Brokaw Road San Jose, CA 95112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHAI, Anant 1501 Hillsdale Blvd., 107 San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 02 /
TSITSIKLIS, John 6 Dover Lane Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 03 /
VAN ROY, Benjamin 1700 De Anza Blvd., 312 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 04 /
CHOU, Andrew 1025 Park Place, 331 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 05 /
MANN, Wallace 16 Madera Way Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US | 06 /
STONE, Jesse, R. 169 Waverley Street, Apt. D Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 07 /
FONG, WungKum 283 13th Street, 331 Oakland, CA 94612 / US | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02752163.2 | 21.06.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002US21178 | Priority number, date | US20010888337 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: US 888337 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03001235 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1449005 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449005 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/04 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
G01S19/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VON ORTSINFORMATION VON ABGETASTETEN POSITIONIERUNGSSIGNALEN | [2004/35] | English: | DETERMINING LOCATION INFORMATION FROM SAMPLED POSITIONING SIGNALS | [2004/35] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A DETERMINER UNE INFORMATION DE LOCALISATION AU MOYEN DE DONNEES ECHANTILLONNEES CONTENANT DES SIGNAUX ET DU BRUIT DETERMINANT CETTE LOCALISATION | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 05.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | IT | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | IE | 21.06.2009 | LU | 21.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | ES | 06.07.2009 | PT | 01.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.06.2009 | ||
LU | 21.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 21.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 25.03.2009 | |
SE | 25.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X] - SAUR E, EIN KREUZKORRELATIONS-EMPFAENGER MIT MINIMIERTEN SYSTEMATISCHEN MESSFEHLERBEITRAEGEN FUER DIE GEODAETISCHE PUNKTBESTIMMUNG MIT DEM GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEM, INAUGURAL-DISSERTATION ZUR ERLANGUNG DES DOKTORGRADES DER HOHEN MATHEMATISCH-NATURWISSENSCHAFTLICHEN FAKULTAET DER RHEINISCHEN FRIEDRICH-WILHELMUS-UNIVERSITAET ZU BONN, 1989, PAGE(S) 1-95, XP001061401 [X] 1-13,16-28 * page 1 - page 5 * * page 9 - page 11 * * page 14 - page 15 * * page 19 - page 24 * * page 35 - page 39 * * page 66 - page 67 * * page 72 - page 82 * | Examination | US4578678 |