EP1402590 - IONOMER FOR USE IN FUEL CELLS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark Delaware 19714-9206 / US | [2007/46] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Guyu Room 204, Number 9, Lane 880, Cangyuan Road Shanghai 200240 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Guomin Room 602, Number 2, Lane 880, Cangyuan Road Shanghai 200240 / CN | 03 /
YAN, Deyue Room 502, Number 38, Lane 885, Quinzhou North Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | 04 /
MARTIN, Charles, W. 9 Sullivan Chase Drive Avondale, PA 19311 / US | 05 /
WU, Huey 25 Harris Circle Newark, DE 19711 / US | 06 /
GULATI, Karine 3705 Highland Drive Boothwyn, PA 19061 / US | 07 /
CAVALCA, Carlos, Alberto 1201 Old Baltimore Pike Newark, DE 19702 / US | 08 /
ZHU, Xinyuan Room 2002. No. 475, Quinzhou North Road Shanghai 200233 / CN | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02752181.4 | 05.07.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002US21346 | Priority number, date | CN2001113257 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: CN 01113257 | CN2002111491 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: CN 02111491 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03005474 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1402590 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402590 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/10, C08K5/22, C08G61/12, H01B1/12, B01D71/00, C08G73/06 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
C08J5/2256 (EP,US);
H01M8/10 (KR);
C08J5/22 (KR);
C08J5/2275 (EP,US);
H01M4/88 (KR);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/1027 (EP,US);
H01M8/103 (EP,US);
H01M8/1032 (EP,US);
C08J2379/00 (EP,US);
H01M4/8605 (EP,US);
H01M4/92 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/46] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IONOMER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN BRENNSTOFFZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [2004/14] | English: | IONOMER FOR USE IN FUEL CELLS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2004/14] | French: | IONOMERE UTILISE DANS DES PILES A COMBUSTIBLE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5254663 (HAY ALLAN S [CA]) [A] 1 * examples 5-14; claim - *; | [A]US5306789 (HAY ALLAN S [CA], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [XPA] - DAI Y ET AL, "Thermostable ultrafiltration and nanofiltration membranes from sulfonated poly(phthalazinone ether sulfone ketone)", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010715), vol. 188, no. 2, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 195 - 203, XP004249685 [XP] 1-25 * page 195 - page 203 * [A] 26-54 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(01)00379-9 | [A] - YI-FENG W ET AL, "Novel aromatic macrocyclic oligomers: intermediates for the preparation of high-performance polymers", REACTIVE & FUNCTIONAL POLYMERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (19960601), vol. 30, no. 1, ISSN 1381-5148, pages 205 - 227, XP004052516 [A] 1,26 * page 205 - page 227 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1381-5148(95)00122-0 |