EP1414871 - GAS-POLYMERIZATION PROCESS OF ETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/19] | PROCESS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE AND INTERPOLYMERS THEREOF | ||
[2014/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTLAKE LONGVIEW CORPORATION 2801 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 600 Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2007/36] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRER, Don, Kent 603 Kenwood Lane Longview, TX 75604 / US | 02 /
DOOLEY, Kenneth, Alan 402 Northwest Drive Longview, TX 75604 / US | 03 /
MOORE, Glenn, Edward 510 Richfield Longview, TX 75605 / US | 04 /
NOBLE, Larry, Allen 8760 Fm 2204 Longview, TX 75603 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02752226.7 | 10.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002US21657 | Priority number, date | US20010912141 | 24.07.2001 Original published format: US 912141 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03010213 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414871 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414871 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/34, C08F10/02, C08F4/649 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (KR);
Y10S526/901 (EP,US);
Y10S526/903 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F2/002 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F2/34 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6492 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6493 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2004/19] | C08F10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Title | German: | GAS-POLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN VON ETHYLEN | [2004/19] | English: | GAS-POLYMERIZATION PROCESS OF ETHYLENE | [2014/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION D'ETHYLENE EN PHASE GAZEUSE | [2014/01] |
Former [2004/19] | PROCESS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE AND INTERPOLYMERS THEREOF | ||
Former [2004/19] | PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION D'ETHYLENE ET SES INTERPOLYMERES | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2014 | BE | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | IE | 10.07.2014 | LU | 10.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 10.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4593010 (MALPASS DENNIS B [US]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]US5118769 (KONDO YOZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [YD]EP0703246 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [YD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0870773 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-3 * examples 1,3,4 *; | [XD]US5863995 (DAIRE ERICK [FR]) [XD] 1-3 * examples 3,4 *; | [YD]US5990251 (GELUS EMMANUEL [FR]) [YD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0058371 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0075202 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * |