EP1523684 - FIDUCIAL ALIGNMENT MARKS ON MICROELECTRONIC SPRING CONTACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FormFactor, Inc. 7005 Southfront Road Livermore, CA 94551 / US | [2005/49] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states FORMFACTOR, INC. 2140 Research Drive Livermore, CA 94550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Robert, C. 380 10th Street n[deg] 29 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 02 /
WATJE, Eric, T. 630 Nicholson Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2006/30] |
Former [2005/16] | 01 /
MARTIN, Robert, C. 474 Clipper Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | ||
02 /
WATJE, Eric, T. 630 Nicholson Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/16] | Käck, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Kahler Käck Mollekopf Patentanwälte Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02752348.9 | 15.07.2002 | [2005/16] | WO2002US22477 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004015432 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1523684 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/073, H01L21/66 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
G01R1/06738 (EP);
G01R1/06794 (EP);
H01L22/00 (KR);
H01L23/544 (EP);
G01R1/06727 (EP);
G01R1/07307 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IE, IT [2005/44] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | JUSTIERMARKEN AUF MIKROELEKTRONISCHEN FEDERKONTAKTEN | [2005/16] | English: | FIDUCIAL ALIGNMENT MARKS ON MICROELECTRONIC SPRING CONTACTS | [2005/16] | French: | MARQUES D'ALIGNEMENT DE REPERE SUR DES CONTACTS A RESSORT MICRO-ELECTRONIQUES | [2005/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/52] | 10.08.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.08.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10160793 ; | [DX]US5864946 (ELDRIDGE BENJAMIN N [US], et al) [DX] 1,3,6,15-18,23,24,26,31-37 * column 1, lines 30-36 * * column 18, line 18 - column 21, line 29; figures 2D-2I * * column 30, line 12 - line 36; figure 5A *; | [X]JPS61154044 ; | [X]JPH0265150 ; | [A]JPH06209033 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10160793 A 19980619 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,11-13,31-34,38-43 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0011] , [0022] - [0034]; figures 1-4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861129), vol. 010, no. 356, Database accession no. (E - 459), & JP61154044 A 19860712 (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,8-10,12,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900521), vol. 014, no. 239, Database accession no. (E - 0930), & JP02065150 A 19900305 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,3,6,8,38-43 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941031), vol. 018, no. 570, Database accession no. (E - 1623), & JP06209033 A 19940726 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | Examination | US6566149 | US2007045874 | WO0016107 |