EP1429974 - RECLOSABLE CONTAINER LID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solo Cup Operating Corporation 1700 Old Deerfield Road Highland Park, IL 60035 / US | [2007/12] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states SOLO CUP COMPANY 1700 Old Deerfield Road Highland Park, IL 60035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Stephen, Alan 868 Appomattox Circle Naperville, IL 60540-7146 / US | 02 /
HUSTON, Dawn, Ellen 224 Thrush Circle Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US | 03 /
WIEDMEYER, Warren, Giles 23215 111th Place Trevor, WI 53179 / US | 04 /
SULLIVAN, Stephen, William 2237 North Harvest Hill Place Round Lake Beach, IL 60073 / US | 05 /
CHIN, Rich, Matthew 4612 Pratt Avenue Lincolnwood, IL 60712 / US | 06 /
AHMED, Mohammed, Maqsood 4624 West Lawrence Avenue Chicago, IL 60630 / US | 07 /
GITSCHLAG, John, Stewart 6708 North Lakewood 3C Chicago, IL 60626 / US | 08 /
LANGELAN, David, Raymond 1116 Randolph Street Oak Park, IL 60302 / US | 09 /
CHAUHAN, Rajendra, Ranjitbhai 5045 Howard Street Skokie, IL 60077 / US | 10 /
HURST, William, Edward 2490 Sun Valley Road Lisle, IL 60532 / US | 11 /
JOINES, James, Tam, Jr. 415 Kingsport Drive Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 12 /
SMITH, Kevin, Ray 2415 North Salem Lane Round Lake Beach, IL 60073 / US | 13 /
ANHALT, Mark, Gerald 4107 West Barnwood Court Franklin, WI 53132 / US | 14 /
RUTTER, Bryce, G. 528 Graeser Road St. Louis, MO 63141 / US | 15 /
BONE, Brian, C. 11155 Fairborough Court St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | 16 /
DOTY, Heath, A. 5711 Nottingham Avenue St Louis MO 63109 / US | [2006/26] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
SMITH, Stephen, Alan 868 Appomattox Circle Naperville, IL 60540-7146 / US | ||
02 /
HUSTON, Dawn, Ellen 224 Thrush Circle Lindenhurst, IL 60046 / US | |||
03 /
WIEDMEYER, Warren, Giles 23215 111th Place Trevor, WI 53179 / US | |||
04 /
SULLIVAN, Stephen, William 2237 North Harvest Hill Place Round Lake Beach, IL 60073 / US | |||
05 /
CHIN, Rich, Matthew 4612 Pratt Avenue Lincolnwood, IL 60712 / US | |||
06 /
AHMED, Mohammed, Maqsood 4624 West Lawrence Avenue Chicago, IL 60630 / US | |||
07 /
GITSCHLAG, John, Stewart 6708 North Lakewood 3C Chicago, IL 60626 / US | |||
08 /
LANGELAN, David, Raymond 1116 Randolph Street Oak Park, IL 60302 / US | |||
09 /
CHAUHAN, Rajendra, Ranjitbhai 5045 Howard Street Skokie, IL 60077 / US | |||
10 /
HURST, William, Edward 2490 Sun Valley Road Lisle, IL 60532 / US | |||
11 /
JOINES, James, Tam, Jr. 415 Kingsport Drive Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | |||
12 /
SMITH, Kevin, Ray 2415 North Salem Lane Round Lake Beach, IL 60073 / US | |||
13 /
ANHALT, Mark, Gerald 4107 West Barnwood Court Franklin, WI 53132 / US | |||
14 /
RUTTER, Bryce, G. 528 Graeser Road St. Louis, MO 63141 / US | |||
15 /
BONE, Brian, C. 11155 Fairborough Court St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | |||
16 /
DOTY, Heath, A. 7512 Dale Avenue Richmond Heights, MO 63117 / US | Representative(s) | McCallum, Graeme David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | McCallum, Graeme David, et al Lloyd Wise, McNeight & Lawrence, Highbank House Exchange Street Stockport, Cheshire SK3 0ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 02752530.2 | 24.07.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002US23352 | Priority number, date | US20010923763 | 06.08.2001 Original published format: US 923763 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03013969 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429974 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429974 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/26 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B65D43/0212 (EP,US);
B65D47/26 (EP,KR,US);
B65D47/265 (EP,US);
B65D55/024 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00046 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00351 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00527 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00638 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00685 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00731 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00796 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00805 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00842 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARER BEHÄLTERDECKEL | [2004/26] | English: | RECLOSABLE CONTAINER LID | [2004/26] | French: | COUVERCLE DE RECIPIENT REFERMABLE | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.03.2007 | BE | 21.03.2007 | CH | 21.03.2007 | CY | 21.03.2007 | CZ | 21.03.2007 | DK | 21.03.2007 | EE | 21.03.2007 | FI | 21.03.2007 | IT | 21.03.2007 | LI | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | SK | 21.03.2007 | TR | 21.03.2007 | BG | 21.06.2007 | SE | 21.06.2007 | GR | 22.06.2007 | ES | 02.07.2007 | IE | 24.07.2007 | LU | 24.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | PT | 21.08.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IT | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
BG | 21.06.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IE | 24.07.2007 | ||
LU | 24.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IT | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IE | 24.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IT | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IE | 24.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IT | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
IE | 24.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
IT | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10129706 ; | [A]DE1816709 (SEP GAND) [A] 1-5,12 * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]GB1576126 (METAL BOX CO LTD) [Y] 16,25 * page 2, line 17 - line 26 * * figure 1 * [A] 15; | [A]GB2091232 (WEATHERCHEM CORP) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0160372 (DENT JILL LESLEY) [A] 1-5,13,14 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2182027 (SUNBEAM PLASTICS CORP) [A] 15,25* figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US4790444 (TERZI DARIO [IT]) [DA] 1-5,8,12 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6095033 (MELTON BRUCE W [US]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-7 *; | [XAY]US6216904 (CAGAN MICHAEL N [ES]) [X] 15,17-24 * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 67 * * figures 7,9-18 * [A] 1-7,9-12 [Y] 16,25 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10129706 A 19980519 (ZOJIRUSHI CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |