EP1417620 - DATA SYNCHRONIZATION INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOREL, Jerry 6500 Torin Road Brentwood Bay, British Columbia V8M2H5 / CA | 02 /
TRUITT, Robert 10198 Wateridge Circle 158 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
YU, Julie 48700 Algonquin Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02752842.1 | 15.08.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002US26035 | Priority number, date | US20010312737P | 15.08.2001 Original published format: US 312737 P | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03017170 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417620 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
H04L67/565 (EP,US);
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US);
H04M15/31 (EP,US);
H04M15/41 (EP,US);
H04M15/70 (EP,US);
H04M15/73 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04M2215/0164 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2026 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENSYNCHRONISIERUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE | [2004/20] | English: | DATA SYNCHRONIZATION INTERFACE | [2004/20] | French: | INTERFACE DE SYNCHRONISATION DE DONNEES | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5970490 (MORGENSTERN MATTHEW [US]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 34 *; | [A]WO0056033 (ORACLE CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 31 *; | [A]US6230168 (UNGER JAY [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US6253239 (SHKLAR LEON [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US6263362 (DONOHO DAVID LEIGH [US], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [X] - SYNCML CONSORTIUM, "SyncML Sync Protocol, version 1.0", SYNCML CONSORTIUM, (20001207), XP002217356 [X] 1-11 * Chapters 1,2,5-8 * | [Y] - "SyncML Representation Protocol, version 1.0", SYNCML REPRESENTATION PROTOCOL, XX, XX, (20001207), pages 1 - 104, XP002217062 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - BUTRICO M A ET AL, "Gold Rush: mobile transaction middleware with Java-object replication", CONFERENCE ON OBJECT-ORIENTED TECHNOLOGIES, XX, XX, (19970616), pages 91 - 101, XP002142965 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5970490 (MORGENSTERN MATTHEW [US]); | [Y]US6230168 (UNGER JAY [US], et al); | [Y]US6253239 (SHKLAR LEON [US], et al); | [Y]US6263362 (DONOHO DAVID LEIGH [US], et al) | by applicant | US5970490 | US6181704 |