EP1405438 - METHOD FOR REGULATING THE TRANSMISSION POWER FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF MULTI-CAST MESSAGES IN A MOBILE RADIO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKMANN, Mark Helene-Engelbrecht-Strasse 107 38124 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
BÄR, Siegfried Hildegardstrasse 22 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | 03 /
CHOI, Hyung-Nam Amrumer Knick 11 22117 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
ECKERT, Michael Hilsstrasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | 05 /
GOTTSCHALK, Thomas Venusstrasse 71 12524 Berlin / DE | 06 /
HANS, Martin Sohldfeld 19 31139 Hildesheim / DE | 07 /
KOWALEWSKI, Frank Schierke 16 38228 Salzgitter / DE | 08 /
SZCZEPANSKI, Arkadius Abelnkarre 2 38100 Braunschweig / DE | [2004/18] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
BECKMANN, Mark Fasanenstrasse 12 38102 Braunschweig / DE | ||
02 /
BÄR, Siegfried Hildegardstrasse 22 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | |||
03 /
CHOI, Hyung-Nam Amrumer Knick 11 22117 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
ECKERT, Michael Hilsstrasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
05 /
GOTTSCHALK, Thomas Venusstrasse 71 12524 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
HANS, Martin Sohldfeld 19 31139 Hildesheim / DE | |||
07 /
KOWALEWSKI, Frank Schierke 16 38228 Salzgitter / DE | |||
08 /
SZCZEPANSKI, Arkadius Abelnkarre 2 38100 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 02752993.2 | 03.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002DE02425 | Priority number, date | DE2001132804 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10132804 | DE2001149549 | 08.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10149549 | DE2001158751 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158751 | [2004/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005603 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405438 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04Q7/28 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
H04W52/327 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSTELLEN DER SENDELEISTUNG FUR DIE UBERTRAGUNG VON MULTICAST-NACHRICHTEN IN EINEM FUNKSYSTEM | [2004/15] | English: | METHOD FOR REGULATING THE TRANSMISSION POWER FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF MULTI-CAST MESSAGES IN A MOBILE RADIO SYSTEM | [2004/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE LA PUISSANCE D'EMISSION POUR LA TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS A PLUSIEURS DESTINATAIRES DANS UN SYSTEME RADIO | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0126397 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,19,21,23,25,31-33,44,45 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 10 *; | [A]EP1063782 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,19,21,23,25,31-33,44,45 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] * | by applicant | WO0126397 | EP1063782 |