EP1387788 - COAST CONTROL FOR WALKIE/RIDER PALLET TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 40 South Washington Street New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | [2004/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOEPER, John, Ivan 703 N. Main St. New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | 02 /
MAGOTO, Daniel, Carl 4242 Miller Road Russia, OH 45363 / US | 03 /
TREGO, Allen, Thomas 507 Sawgrass Lane Hampshire, IL 60140 / US | 04 /
SCHLOEMER, James, Francis 09742 County Road 66A New Bremen, OH 45869 / US | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 02753329.8 | 09.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002US14899 | Priority number, date | US20010855333 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: US 855333 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02092410 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387788 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387788 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62B5/06, B62D51/00 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B62B5/06 (EP,US);
B62D1/14 (EP,US);
B62D51/002 (EP,US);
B62B5/063 (EP,US);
H01H2009/068 (EP,US);
H01H2300/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/34] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUBBETRIEBSSTEUERUNG EINES HAND/MITFAHR-PALETTENHUBWAGENS | [2004/07] | English: | COAST CONTROL FOR WALKIE/RIDER PALLET TRUCK | [2004/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE ROULAGE EN ROUE LIBRE POUR CHARIOT DE MANUTENTION DE PALETTES A CONDUCTEUR PORTE OU A PIED | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.05.2010 | [2011/35] | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5964313 (GUY DOUGLAS S [CA]) [DA] 1,8,12,19,23 * column 5, line 53 - line 65; figure 3 *; | [DA]US3791474 (STAMMEN H, et al) [DA] 1,8,12,19,23 * abstract *; | [A]DE29622086U (MARIKA NIPPERT KOEHLER NIKO MA [DE]) [A] 1,3,7-9 * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US5245144 | US3791474 | US4716980 | US5964313 |