EP1436686 - CENTRALIZED RESOURCE MANAGER WITH PASSIVE SENSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ucentric Holdings Inc. 2 Clock Tower Place Suite 350 Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Ucentric Holdings Inc. 2 Clock Tower Place, Suite 350 Maynard, MA 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPARRELL, Carlton, J. 3A Wadden Ct. Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | 02 /
VASILEVSKY, Alexander 5 Gooseneck Lane Westford, MA 01886 / US | 03 /
WATLINGTON, John 4 Pinewood Rd. Acton, Ma 01720 / US | 04 /
LIVELY, David, F. 6 Cranberry Lane Hudson, MA 01749 / US | 05 /
KOKOVIDIS, Georgios 2 Bemis Ave. Waltham, Ma 02453 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02753526.9 | 23.08.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US27014 | Priority number, date | US20010323618P | 20.09.2001 Original published format: US 323618 P | US20020350431P | 19.01.2002 Original published format: US 350431 P | US20020372490P | 12.04.2002 Original published format: US 372490 P | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03025726 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436686 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26, G06F1/28, G06F1/30, G06F1/32, G06F11/30, H04N7/173 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H04L41/5019 (EP,US);
G06F1/266 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L12/2805 (EP,US);
H04L12/2814 (EP,US);
H04L12/2834 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/72 (EP,US);
H04L47/765 (EP,US);
H04L47/781 (EP,US);
H04L47/801 (EP,US);
H04L47/822 (EP,US);
H04L47/826 (EP,US);
H04L65/1043 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/1008 (EP,US);
H04L67/101 (EP,US);
H04L67/1031 (EP,US);
H04N21/258 (EP,US);
H04N21/4112 (EP,US);
H04N21/4113 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/42202 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4335 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/4363 (EP,US);
H04N21/43632 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/44227 (EP,US);
H04N21/44231 (EP,US);
H04N21/4424 (EP,US);
H04N21/462 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N7/162 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
G06F2200/261 (EP,US);
H04L12/2801 (EP,US);
H04L12/2809 (EP,US);
H04L12/2812 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2849 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04W28/16 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRALISIERTER BETRIEBSMITTELMANAGER MIT PASSIVEM ERFASSUNGSSYSTEM | [2004/29] | English: | CENTRALIZED RESOURCE MANAGER WITH PASSIVE SENSING SYSTEM | [2004/29] | French: | GESTIONNAIRE DE RESSOURCES CENTRALISEES A SYSTEME DE DETECTION PASSIF | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4439784 (FURUKAWA HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 34 - line 42 * * column 3, line 1 - line 58 * * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 13 ** figures 3A,3B,3C *; | [Y]US5331353 (LEVENSON RANDAL P [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * column A * * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 19 * * figures 4-7 *; | [A]US5565908 (AHMAD KHURSHID [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 10 - line 51 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 21 * * column 4, line 45 - line 54 * * column 6, line 36 - line 57 * * column 7, line 25 - line 35 * * figures 1,2,6 *; | [Y]US5831663 (WATERHOUSE JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,8-11,13-15,17 * column 4, line 1 - line 8 * * column 5, line 8 - line 19 * * figure 3 *; | [XAY]WO0059230 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1 * column A * * page 5, line 2 - page 7, line 3 * * page 15, line 25 - page 20, line 8 * * page 23, line 5 - line 22 * * figures 1-3,7,8 * [A] 7,12,16 [Y] 2-6,8-11,13-15,17 | International search | [A]US4439784 (FURUKAWA HAJIME [JP], et al); | [Y]US5416508 (SAKUMA KAZUSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5565908 (AHMAD KHURSHID [US]) |