EP1373767 - VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wiederkehr, Hans Neuhofstrasse 25 8315 Lindau / CH | For all designated states Wiederkehr, Kurt Neuhofstrasse 25 8315 Lindau / CH | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat. Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02753568.1 | 18.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002EP02969 | Priority number, date | DE2001112962 | 17.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112962 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02075186 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1373767 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1373767 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/30 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
F16K1/306 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7794 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7801 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7808 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL | [2004/01] | English: | VALVE | [2004/01] | French: | CLAPET | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.05.2005 | FI | 25.05.2005 | IE | 25.05.2005 | TR | 25.05.2005 | DK | 25.08.2005 | GR | 25.08.2005 | PT | 27.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
IE | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
IE | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 25.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XA]BE553847 (SCHULTZ & RACKOW) [X] 1,9,10 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 16; figure 1 * [A] 13-15; | [XA]GB784820 (PAOLO ALOISI) [X] 1,9 * page 1, line 71 - page 2, line 94; figure 3 * [A] 12; | [X]DE1084215 (BAHCO AB) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 55; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4815692 (LOISEAU GERARD [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 29; figure 1 *; | [X]US5520214 (MACK BRIAN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-11,18,19 * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-3,6,7 *; | [A]EP0768484 (ANGELOTTI PIER LUIGI [IT]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US5678602 (CANNET GILLES [FR], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 2, lines 42-44; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0102761 (EUSEBI IMPIANTI S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1,18,19 * figure 3 * |