EP1423603 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/34] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELAS, Zlatko Friedhofsweg 6 71665 Vaihingen / DE | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754214.1 | 14.06.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002DE02176 | Priority number, date | DE2001142302 | 29.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10142302 | [2004/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03027487 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423603 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423603 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/12, F02M51/06 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
F02M51/0671 (EP,US);
F02M61/12 (KR);
F02M51/0682 (EP,US);
F02M51/0685 (EP,US);
F02M2200/505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/34] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL | [2004/23] | English: | FUEL INJECTION VALVE | [2004/23] | French: | SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19503224 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 49-66; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 1-5,15,16 * * column 4, lines 59,60 *; | [A]JPS59201966 ; | [A]GB880369 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 77-98; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1092865 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5875975 (REITER FERDINAND [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4944486 (BABITZKA RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850330), vol. 009, no. 070, Database accession no. (M - 367), & JP59201966 A 19841115 (AISAN KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19626576 |