EP1402170 - CONTROL MODULE FOR AN INJECTOR OF AN ACCUMULATOR INJECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Revocation of patent | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states VDO Automotive AG Siemensstrasse 12 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive AG Siemenstrasse 12 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOCHING, Wolfgang Am Rosenstock 58 88085 Langenargen / DE | 02 /
SCHÜRZ, Willibald Lindenweg 3 93188 Pielenhofen / DE | [2004/14] | Application number, filing date | 02754296.8 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002DE02383 | Priority number, date | DE20011031953 | 02.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10131953 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004862 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1402170 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402170 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1402170 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
F02M61/168 (EP,US);
F02M47/02 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M2200/21 (EP,US);
F02M2547/003 (EP,US);
F02M61/1866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/03] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | STEUERMODUL FÜR EINEN INJEKTOR EINES SPEICHEREINSPRITZSYSTEMS | [2004/14] | English: | CONTROL MODULE FOR AN INJECTOR OF AN ACCUMULATOR INJECTION SYSTEM | [2004/14] | French: | MODULE DE COMMANDE DESTINE A UN INJECTEUR D'UN SYSTEME D'INJECTION A ACCUMULATEUR | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/48] | 25.11.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.09.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.01.2008 | IT | 16.01.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/04] | GB | 16.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10030119 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-12 * column 7, line 25 - line 37; figure - *; | [X]GB2340610 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-12 * page 3; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19827267 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,5-12 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]DE10015268 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,8-12 * column 3, line 33 - line 52; figure - *; | [XA]GB2335000 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,9-12 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 3; figure - * [A] 6,7; | [X]WO0050761 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,9-12 * abstract * | Examination | EP0333096 | EP0427266 |