EP1415056 - Panel and fastening system for panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/19] | PANEL AND FASTENING SYSTEM FOR SUCH A PANEL | ||
[2005/33] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzenta Paneele + Profile GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 18-20 56759 Kaisersesch / DE | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNIG, Hans, Jürgen Eidechsenweg 8 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, et al Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, et al Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Patentanwälte, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754315.6 | 04.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002DE02444 | Priority number, date | DE20011038285 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10138285 | [2004/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03016654 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415056 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415056 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/04, E04F15/02, F16B5/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP,US);
E04F15/02 (EP,US);
F16B5/0012 (EP,US);
F16B5/0044 (EP,US);
F16B5/0056 (EP,US);
F16B5/0064 (EP,US);
F16B5/008 (EP,US);
E04F15/04 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0138 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0153 (EP,US);
E04F2201/023 (EP,US);
E04F2201/026 (EP,US);
E04F2201/03 (EP,US);
E04F2201/042 (EP,US);
E04F2201/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Paneel sowie Befestigungssystem für Paneele | [2005/33] | English: | Panel and fastening system for panels | [2005/33] | French: | Panneau et système de fixation pour panneaux | [2005/33] |
Former [2004/19] | PANEEL SOWIE BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR PANEELE | ||
Former [2004/19] | PANEL AND FASTENING SYSTEM FOR SUCH A PANEL | ||
Former [2004/19] | PLAQUES DE REVETEMENT ET SYSTEME DE FIXATION POUR LESDITES PLAQUES | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 16.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06000431.4 / EP1669512 | EP08100112.5 / EP1953309 | EP10157450.7 / EP2194210 | EP10158660.0 / EP2196596 | EP10178642.4 / EP2345775 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2006
18.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Välinge Innovation AB Apelvägen 2 260 40 Viken / SE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | 02
10.10.2006
24.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Kronotex GmbH & Co. KG Wittstocker CHausee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2006
18.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Välinge Innovation AB Apelvägen 2 260 40 Viken / SE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
02
10.10.2006
24.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Kronotex GmbH & Co. KG Wittstocker CHausee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
Former [2009/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2006
18.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Välinge Innovation AB Apelvägen 2 260 40 Viken / SE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
02
10.10.2006
24.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Kronotex GmbH & Co. KG Wittstocker CHausee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
Former [2007/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2006
18.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Välinge Innovation AB Apelvägen 2 260 40 Viken / SE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
02
10.10.2006
24.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Kronotex GmbH & Co. KG Wittstocker CHausee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | |||
Former [2006/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2006
18.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE Välinge Innovation AB Apelvägen 2 260 40 Viken / SE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas, et al, et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
02
10.10.2006
KRONOTEX Fussboden GmbH & Co. KG Wittstocker Chaussee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE Opponent's representative Rehmann, Thorsten, et al, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | 17.11.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.03.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.10.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.06.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/36] | Appeal following opposition | 03.01.2008 | Appeal received No. T2024/07 | 29.02.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.06.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | 18.12.2007 | Appeal received No. T2024/07 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.01.2006 | FI | 04.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2007/45] | FI | 04.07.2006 | |
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | IT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 04.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.07.2006 | |
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | MC | 31.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5274979 (TSAI JUI-HSING [TW]) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO9627719 (PERSTORP FLOORING AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,6-9,15,16 * page 3, line 28 - page 5, line 20; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9966151 (VALINGE ALUMINIUM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1* page 17, line 20 - page 22, line 36; figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO0102669 (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 13, line 24 - page 24, line 5; figures 1-12 *; | [XA]WO0151732 (HUELSTA WERKE HUELS KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,16 * page 17, line 6 - page 26, line 5; figures 1-13 * [A] 15 | Examination | WO8402155 | WO9840583 | by applicant | DE19929896 |