EP1417418 - INSULATING SHEET PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRISCHMANN, Albert Hürnheimweg 3 79341 Kenzingen / DE | 02 /
RIEGER, Johannes Burgunderstrasse 15 79336 Herbolzheim / DE | [2004/20] | Application number, filing date | 02754717.3 | 20.06.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002EP06823 | Priority number, date | DE2001140278 | 16.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10140278 | [2004/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03016725 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417418 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/04, F16B13/00, E04B1/48 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
E04B1/7633 (EP,US);
F16L59/12 (KR);
E04F13/0835 (EP,US);
F16B13/04 (EP,US);
F16B2013/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | ISOLIERPLATTENDÜBEL | [2004/20] | English: | INSULATING SHEET PLUG | [2004/20] | French: | CHEVILLE DE PLAQUE D'ISOLATION | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3907034 (UPAT MAX LANGENSIEPEN KG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,8 *; | [A]US5171118 (ROTHENBUEHLER WALTER [CH]) [A] 1-6 * figure 5 *; | [A]DE4321153 (KNOCHE ALFONS [DE]) [A] 1-6* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0644301 (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0765979 (EJOT KUNSTSTOFFTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure 2 * |