EP1406728 - PROCESS FOR ACTIVATION OF DRUGS IN A VIBRATIONAL MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURAND PHARMACEUTICALS LTD. Block 1, Harcourt Centre, Harcourt Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2004/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBETTI, Luca Via Vaglieri, 9/3 I-34100 Trieste / IT | 02 /
BRESCIANI, Massimo Via delle Campanelle, 170 I-34100 Trieste / IT | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/16] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02754775.1 | 27.06.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002EP07117 | Priority number, date | IE20010000626 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: IE 20010626 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03002259 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406728 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406728 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/14, B02C17/20 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
B02C17/20 (EP,US);
A61K9/14 (EP,US);
B02C17/14 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ARZNEIMITTELAKTIVIERUNG IN EINER SCHWINGMÜHLE | [2004/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR ACTIVATION OF DRUGS IN A VIBRATIONAL MILL | [2004/16] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A ACTIVER DES MEDICAMENTS DANS UN BROYEUR A VIBRATIONS | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 29.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.11.2004 | TR | 03.11.2004 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | SE | 03.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | CY | 27.06.2005 | LU | 27.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2020/23] |
Former [2011/32] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
PT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 27.06.2005 | ||
LU | 27.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
PT | 03.04.2005 | ||
CY | 27.06.2005 | ||
IT | 27.06.2005 | ||
LU | 27.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/34] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
CY | 27.06.2005 | ||
IT | 27.06.2005 | ||
LU | 27.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
CY | 27.06.2005 | ||
LU | 27.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
CY | 27.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4932166 (BOECKER WOLFGANG D G [US], et al) [A] 1,9* claims 13,14 *; | [A]WO9632931 (VECTORPHARMA INT [IT], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 13, paragraph L - page 15 * * abstract *; | [A]US5626662 (URBAN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 23 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 2 * |