EP1412104 - METHOD FOR REMOVING DEPOSITS FROM CHEMICAL REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REISINGER, Claus-Peter 31220 Oak Creek Drive Wixom, MI 48393 / US | 02 /
HANSEN, Sven, Michael Markplatz 2 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
FISCHER, Peter Mühlenbach 28 50676 Köln / DE | 04 /
TRIEBENECK, Konrad Clemensstr. 5 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 05 /
HELBIG, Joachim Thielenstr. 31 50825 Köln / DE | [2004/32] |
Former [2004/18] | 01 /
REISINGER, Claus-Peter 31220 Oak Creek Drive Wixom, MI 48393 / US | ||
02 /
HANSEN, Sven, Michael Stettiner Str. 33 47829 Krefeld / DE | |||
03 /
FISCHER, Peter Mühlenbach 28 50676 Köln / DE | |||
04 /
TRIEBENECK, Konrad Clemensstr. 5 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
05 /
HELBIG, Joachim Thielenstr. 31 50825 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754846.0 | 08.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002EP07571 | Priority number, date | DE2001135318 | 19.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10135318 | [2004/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03008116 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412104 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/08, B08B9/057, B01J19/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B08B9/057 (EP,US);
B01J19/002 (EP,US);
B08B9/08 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON ABLAGERUNGEN AN CHEMISCHEN REAKTOREN | [2004/18] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING DEPOSITS FROM CHEMICAL REACTORS | [2004/18] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ELIMINER DES DEPOTS DANS DES REACTEURS CHIMIQUES | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/38] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2000987 (ICI LTD) [X] 1-4,7-9,12-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US4300625 (MIKHAILOV GEROLD M, et al) [X] 1-7,12-16 * column W *; | [XA]EP0053355 (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-7,9,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 12,13; | [X]US4968447 (DIXON DONALD R [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,14,15 * column A * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 55 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 51 * * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 2 *; | [XA]EP0633061 (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,10,14 * abstract * * page 3, line 45 - page 5, line 6; figure - *[A] 12,13 |