EP1418998 - METHOD FOR THE SEPARATION OF BLOOD PLASMA PARTICLES FROM A BLOOD PLASMA SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | |||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOLZ, Jürgen Am Junkernkamp 1f 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
LONGERICH, Markus Berrenrather Str. 351 50937 Köln / DE | 03 /
HIMMEN, Ernst-Ulrich Hauptstr. 61 51519 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
ESSER, Ulrich Raiffeisenstr. 43 51515 Kürten / DE | 05 /
SHARMA, Rajesh 926 Brook Drive Cary, NC 27519 / US | 06 /
PATWARDHAN, Anshuman, V. 114 Hidden Oaks Drive, Apt. 1C Cary, NC 27513 / US | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Feldhues, Michael L.F., et al Bayer MaterialScience AG LP-PL 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | Feldhues, Michael, Dr., et al c/o Bayer MaterialScience AG, Law & Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754954.2 | 30.07.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002EP08444 | Priority number, date | DE2001139466 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139466 | [2004/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03013686 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1418998 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418998 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1418998 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/26, B04B5/04 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
B04B15/08 (EP,US);
B01D21/009 (EP,US);
B01D21/2444 (EP,US);
B01D21/2483 (EP,US);
B01D21/26 (EP,US);
B01D21/262 (EP,US);
B01D21/34 (EP,US);
B04B1/14 (EP,US);
B04B11/04 (EP,US);
B04B11/05 (EP,US);
B04B15/02 (EP,US);
B04B5/0442 (EP,US);
B01D2221/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON BLUTPLASMAPARTIKELN AUS EINER BLUTPLASMASUSPENSION | [2004/21] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SEPARATION OF BLOOD PLASMA PARTICLES FROM A BLOOD PLASMA SUSPENSION | [2004/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DE PARTICULES DE PLASMA SANGUIN CONTENUES DANS UNE SUSPENSION DE PLASMA SANGUIN | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.10.2005 | CZ | 26.10.2005 | EE | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | IE | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | SK | 26.10.2005 | TR | 26.10.2005 | BG | 26.01.2006 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | SE | 26.01.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 26.10.2005 | |
EE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 26.10.2005 | |
EE | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CZ | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IE | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
BG | 26.01.2006 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
SK | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 26.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5328441 (CARR ROBERT B [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** column 2, line 29 - line 46 *; | [A]US5743840 (CARR ROBERT B [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO0067911 (BAYER AG [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |