EP1466218 - OPTICAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomas Swan & Co. Ltd. Crookhall, Consett County Durham DH8 7ND / GB | [2017/11] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Thomas Swan & Co. Ltd. Crookhall, Consett County Durham DH8 7ND / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMES, Melanie 39 Orford Street Ipswich IP1 3PE / GB | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/42] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02755305.6 | 02.09.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002GB04011 | Priority number, date | GB20010021308 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0121308 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03021341 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1466218 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466218 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/00, G03H1/08 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
G02F1/3132 (EP,US);
G02B26/06 (US);
G02B26/0833 (US);
G02B5/32 (EP,US);
G02B6/266 (EP,US);
G02B6/29314 (EP,US);
G02B6/2938 (US);
G02B6/3548 (EP,US);
G02B6/3556 (EP,US);
G02F1/1326 (US);
G02F1/1335 (US);
G02F1/29 (EP,US);
G02F1/31 (EP,US);
G03H1/0005 (EP,US);
G03H1/02 (US);
G03H1/04 (US);
G03H1/08 (EP,US);
G03H1/2286 (EP,US);
G03H1/2294 (EP,US);
G03H1/26 (US);
H04J14/0212 (EP,US);
H04J14/0213 (EP,US);
H04J14/0219 (EP,US);
H04J14/08 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
G02B26/0808 (US);
G02B6/29311 (EP,US);
G02B6/29391 (EP,US);
G02B6/3512 (EP,US);
G02B6/3534 (EP,US);
G02F1/13342 (US);
G02F1/291 (EP,US);
G02F2201/30 (US);
G02F2201/34 (US);
G02F2203/12 (US);
G02F2203/28 (US);
G02F2203/50 (US);
G03H1/0866 (US);
G03H1/0891 (US);
G03H2001/0224 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0491 (EP,US);
G03H2001/261 (EP,US);
G03H2001/264 (US);
G03H2222/13 (EP,US);
G03H2222/32 (EP,US);
G03H2223/23 (EP,US);
G03H2225/32 (EP,US);
G03H2225/52 (EP,US);
G03H2225/60 (EP,US);
G03H2226/02 (EP,US);
H04J14/021 (EP,US);
H04J14/0217 (EP,US);
H04J14/022 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0016 (US);
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | G03H1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VERARBEITUNG | [2004/42] | English: | OPTICAL PROCESSING | [2004/42] | French: | TRAITEMENT OPTIQUE | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 31.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12168405.4 / EP2508951 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 01.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | IE | 02.09.2017 | LU | 02.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.09.2017 | ||
LU | 02.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.09.2017 | ||
LU | 02.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.09.2017 | ||
LU | 02.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.09.2017 | ||
LU | 02.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO0190823 (INTELLIGENT PIXELS INC [US]) [XP] 1,2,4-6,9,11,12,14,15,20,22 * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 25 * * page 11, line 17 - page 13, line 12 * * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 25 * * page 16, lines 10-18; figures 2A,5 *; | [X]WO0125848 (SWAN THOMAS & CO LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12,14,20-22 * pages 18-49; figures 2,7,9-14 *; | [X]WO0125840 (SWAN THOMAS & CO LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * figures 3-5,8; claim 17 *; | [X]US5539543 (LIU HUA-KUANG [US], et al) [X] 22 * column 5, lines 25-57 *; | [E]WO02101451 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [E] 23-27 * figure 5 *; | [X]US5107359 (OHUCHIDA SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 24,27 * figures 1,3 *; | [A] - MEARS R J ET AL, "TELECOMMUNICATIONS APPLICATIONS OF FERROELECTRIC LIQUID-CRYSTAL SMART PIXELS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, (199604), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1077-260X, pages 35 - 46, XP002155684 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2944.541873 | [XA] - MEARS R J ET AL, "WDM CHANNEL MANAGEMENT USING PROGRAMMABLE HOLOGRAPHIC ELEMENTS", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON MULTIWAVELENGTH OPTICAL NETWORKS: DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND NETWORK IMPLEMENTATIONS, IEE, LONDON, GB, (19980618), pages 11 - 1-11-6, XP000783511 [X] 23-25,27 * pages 11-5; figure 7 * [A] 16,17,19,28 | [A] - PAN CI-LING ET AL, "Tunable semiconductor laser with liquid crystal pixel mirror in grating-loaded external cavity", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19990819), vol. 35, no. 17, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1472 - 1473, XP006012546 [A] 16,17 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19990960 | Examination | US5684612 | US5682214 | - HOLMES M J ET AL, "Low crosstalk devices for wavelength-routed networks", (19950101), pages 2/1 - 210, XP006528352 | - CROSSLAND W A ET AL, "Holographic Optical Switching: The ROSES Demonstrator", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20001201), vol. 18, no. 12, ISSN 0733-8724, XP011029829 | by applicant | WO0125848 |