EP1524689 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NINOMIYA, Keiji Mitsubishi Denki KK 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
ITOH, Kenji Mitsubishi Denki KK 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
JOBA, Hiroyuki Mitsubishi Denki KK 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/16] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02755645.5 | 24.07.2002 | [2005/16] | WO2002JP07513 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004010497 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1524689 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/12 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L23/49541 (EP,US);
H01L23/50 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48253 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48257 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49111 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49111, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49111, H01L2224/48257, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48257, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/46] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2005/16] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2005/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2005/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2004 | Translation filed | 18.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 19.06.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07312404 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH09223705 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US6025640 (YAGI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [AE]JP2002313980 (NIIGATA SEIMITSU KK) |