EP1437217 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CELLULOSE ACYLATE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Tsukasa, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02755716.4 | 31.07.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002JP07799 | Priority number, date | JP20010231235 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001231235 | JP20010231236 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001231236 | JP20010246403 | 15.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001246403 | [2004/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03011590 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437217 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B23/20, B29C41/12, B29C41/22, G02B5/30, C08L1/12 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
B32B23/20 (KR);
B32B17/08 (EP,US);
B32B17/10018 (EP,US);
B32B23/00 (EP,US);
B32B23/04 (US);
B32B27/00 (EP,US);
C08J5/00 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
G03C1/795 (EP,US);
B29C41/26 (EP,US);
B29C41/28 (EP,US);
B32B2317/18 (US);
B32B2551/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZELLULOSEACYLATFOLIE | [2004/29] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CELLULOSE ACYLATE FILM | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN FILM D'ACYLATE DE CELLULOSE | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2004 | Translation filed | 02.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05200942 ; | [A]DD237386 (WOLFEN FILMFAB VEB [DD]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 36, Database accession no. 1993-285152, XP002298223 & JPH05200942 A 19930810 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP8323785 A 19961210 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH08143708 (DAICEL CHEM); | [X]JPH08207210 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JPH1045950 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JPH1058514 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11254594 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000317960 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |