EP1446687 - OPTICAL JUNCTION APPARATUS AND METHODS EMPLOYING OPTICAL POWER TRANSVERSE-TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/34] | OPTICAL JUNCTION APPARATUS AND METHODS EMPLOYING OPTICAL POWER TRANSVERSE-TRANSFER | ||
[2012/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION USA 101 Metro Drive, Suite 500 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2009/20] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Xponent Photonics, Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAUVELT, Henri A., Xponent Photonics Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | 02 /
VAHALA, Kerry J., Xponent Photonics Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | 03 /
VERNOOY, David W., Xponent Photonics Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | 04 /
PASLASKI, Joel S., Xponent Photonics Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | [2012/19] |
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
BLAUVELT, Henri A., Xponent Photonics Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | ||
02 /
VAHALA, Kerry J., Xponent Photonics Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | |||
03 /
VERNOOY, David W., Xponent Photonics Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | |||
04 /
PASLASKI, Joel S., Xponent Photonics Inc. 425 East Huntington Drive Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [2012/19] |
Former [2004/34] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02756342.8 | 28.06.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002US20668 | Priority number, date | US20010334705P | 30.10.2001 Original published format: US 334705 P | US20020360261P | 27.02.2002 Original published format: US 360261 P | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03038497 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1446687 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446687 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/30, G02B6/42, // G02B6/12, G02B6/28 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/2852 (EP,US);
G02B6/42 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/12002 (EP,US);
G02B6/12007 (EP,US);
G02B6/1228 (EP,US);
G02B6/125 (EP,US);
G02B6/2804 (EP,US);
G02B6/2821 (EP,US);
G02B6/30 (EP,US);
G02B6/4204 (EP,US);
G02B6/423 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12119 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12195 (EP,US);
G02B6/305 (EP,US);
G02B6/4232 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | G02B6/26, G02B6/36, G02B6/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/19] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN, DIE TRANSVERS-TRANSFER OPTISCHER ENERGIE VERWENDEN | [2004/34] | English: | OPTICAL JUNCTION APPARATUS AND METHODS EMPLOYING OPTICAL POWER TRANSVERSE-TRANSFER | [2012/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE JONCTION OPTIQUE ET PROCEDES DANS LESQUELS ON UTILISE UN TRANSFERT TRANSVERSAL DE LA PUISSANCE OPTIQUE | [2004/34] |
Former [2004/34] | OPTICAL JUNCTION APPARATUS AND METHODS EMPLOYING OPTICAL POWER TRANSVERSE-TRANSFER | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5123070 (BRADLEY ERIC M [US]) [X] 1,14 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5568579 (OKANIWA KAORU [JP]) [Y] 6,19 * column 4; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]US6064783 (CONGDON PHILIP A [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-11,14,17,18,20-24 * columns 2,3; figure 4b * [Y] 6,19; | [A]WO0106279 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al) [A] 1,14 * figure 13 *; | [X]US2001031122 (LACKRITZ HILARY S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14-16 * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0129]; figures 10-12 *; | [X] - SENICHI SUZUKI ET AL, "INTEGRATED-OPTIC RING RESONATORS WITH TWO STACKED LAYERS OF SILICA WAVEGUIDE ON SI", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19921101), vol. 4, no. 11, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1256 - 1258, XP000328573 [X] 1,2,14,15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.166960 | [A] - LIU BIN ET AL, "A wavelength multiplexer using cascaded three-dimensional vertical couplers", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20000117), vol. 76, no. 3, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 282 - 284, XP012025680 [A] 1,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.125722 | [A] - SEKIMOTO T ET AL, "VERTICAL ANTIRESONANT REFLECTING OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE COUPLER FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL OPTICAL INTERCONNECTS: OPTIMUM DESIGN FOR LARGE TOLERANCE, HIGH COUPLING AFFICIENCY, AND SHORT COUPLING LENGTH", APPLIED OPTICS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20000120), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 426 - 430, XP000931996 [A] 1,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.39.000426 | International search | [A]US4097177 (CLOSE ROSS A); | [A]US5568579 (OKANIWA KAORU [JP]); | [A]US6064783 (CONGDON PHILIP A [US], et al); | [X]US6065881 (OKADA JUNJI [JP], et al); | [AP]US6385376 (BOWERS JOHN E [US], et al); | [XP]US2002064345 (KIKUCHI HIDEO [JP], et al) | Examination | US5199092 |