EP1418995 - TOY BALL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhino Toys, Inc. 343 Soquel Avenue 50 Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | [2004/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERGLATE, David 343 Soquel Avenue 50 Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02756657.9 | 24.07.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002US23655 | Priority number, date | US20010308502P | 28.07.2001 Original published format: US 308502 P | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03011415 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1418995 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/08 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
A63H33/08 (EP,US);
A63B43/00 (EP,US);
A63B2208/12 (EP,US);
A63H33/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIELBALLGERÄT | [2004/21] | English: | TOY BALL APPARATUS | [2004/21] | French: | JOUET EN FORME DE BOULE | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/20] | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2956806 (ROUTSON EDWIN J) [X] 1,4,7,8,17 * the whole document *; | [X]US5104125 (WILSON JOHN [US]) [X] 1,4-12,14-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US5177926 (FRANKEL ARIE [US]) [X] 1,8,14-17 * the whole document *; | [DX]US5236196 (BLANKENBURG KARL [US], et al) [DX] 1-6,9-11,14-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US5340349 (BERG-FERNSTRUM ROSEMARY [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,15,17 * the whole document *; | [X]US6059631 (MADDOCK PAUL THOMAS [CA]) [X] 1,4-8,15,17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0058575 (PROVITOLA ANTHONY I [US]) [X] 1-8,15,17 * page 15, line 43 - page 16, line 3; figure 84 *; | [PX]US6418673 (FLOWERDAY FREDERICK G [US]) [PX] 1-8,15,17 * column 8, line 45 - line 67; claim 1 *; | [E]EP1316441 (DENTSU TEC INC [JP]) [E] 1,4-17* paragraphs [0007] , [0025] , [0032] , [0036] , [0038]; figure 5 * | International search | [X]US5236196 (BLANKENBURG KARL [US], et al); | [Y]US3889950 (KASRAVI PETER B); | [A]US3046016 (LAWS LEONARD S) | by applicant | US3889950 |