EP1434875 - GENE POLYMORPHISMS AND RESPONSE TO TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOW, David, J GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SGI 2NY / GB | 02 /
DUNCAN, Ben 20225 Bothell-Everett Hwy 2232 Bothell, WA 98012 / US | 03 /
HUGHES, Arlene, R GlaxoSmithKline, Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 04 /
MANASCO, Penelope 9801 Adlie Drive Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US | 05 /
PILLAI, Sreekumar, G GlaxoSmithKline, Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 06 /
SPAULDING, Theodore, C GlaxoSmithKline, Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 07 /
SPRAGGS, Colin, F GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SGI 2NY / GB | 08 /
STUBBINS, Michael, GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Park N & E, Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM 19 5AW / GB | 09 /
XU, Chun-Fang GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SGI 2NY / GB | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Thornley, Rachel Mary GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Thornley, Rachel Mary GlaxoSmithKline, Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02757011.8 | 07.08.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US25060 | Priority number, date | US20010313918P | 21.08.2001 Original published format: US 313918 P | US20010337819P | 08.11.2001 Original published format: US 337819 P | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018843 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434875 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
C12Y104/03004 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/70571 (EP,US);
C12N9/0022 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 18.03.2004 | LV | 18.03.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 18.03.2004 | SI | 18.03.2004 | Title | German: | GENPOLYMORPHISMEN UND ANSPRECHEN AUF BEHANDLUNG | [2004/28] | English: | GENE POLYMORPHISMS AND RESPONSE TO TREATMENT | [2004/28] | French: | POLYMORPHISMES GENIQUES ET REPONSE A UN TRAITEMENT | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/35] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0148246 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y] - WILLIAMS K V ET AL, "5-HTT gene polymorphism predicts early sibutramine weight loss", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY, & 10TH EUROPEAN CONGRESS ON OBESITY OF THE EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF OBESITY; ANTWERP, BELGIUM; MAY 24-27, 2000, (200005), vol. 24, no. Supplement 1, ISSN 0307-0565, page S41, XP001184089 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * | [Y] - HEAL D J ET AL, "SIBUTRAMINE: A NOVEL ANTI-OBESTIY DRUG. A REVIEW OF THE PHARMACOLOGICAL EVIDENCE TO DIFFERENTIATE IT FROM D-AMPHETAMINE AND D-FENFLURAMINE", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY, NEWMAN PUBLISHING, LONDON, GB, (199808), vol. 22, no. SUPPL 1, ISSN 0307-0565, pages S18 - S28, XP008005119 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * | [Y] - STOEBER GERALD ET AL, "Tourette syndrome and the norepinephrine transporter gene: Results of a systematic mutation screening", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETICS, (19990416), vol. 88, no. 2, ISSN 0148-7299, pages 158 - 163, XP002303021 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-8628(19990416)88:2<158::AID-AJMG12>3.0.CO;2-W | [Y] - BOENISCH H ET AL, "The human desipramine-sensitive noradrenaline transporter and the importance of defined amino acids for its function", JOURNAL OF AUTONOMIC PHARMACOLOGY, (199912), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0144-1795, pages 327 - 333, XP009038886 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * | [Y] - RUNKEL FABIAN ET AL, "Pharmacological properties of naturally occurring variants of the human norepinephrine transporter", PHARMACOGENETICS, (200007), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 0960-314X, pages 397 - 405, XP009038850 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00008571-200007000-00003 | [Y] - PIRKE K M ET AL, "PLASMA NOREPINEPHRINE AFTER A STANDARDIZED TEST MEAL IN ACUTE AND REMITTED PATIENTS WITH ANOREXIA NERVOSA AND IN HEALTHY CONTROLS", BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, (1992), vol. 31, no. 10, ISSN 0006-3223, pages 1074 - 1077, XP002303022 [Y] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-3223(92)90102-6 | International search | [A] - STOBER ET AL., "Systematic search for variation in the human norepinephrine transporter gene: identification of five naturally occurring missense mutations and study of association with major psychiatric disorders", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETIS (NEUROPSYCHIATRIC GENETICS), (1996), vol. 67, pages 523 - 532, XP002958567 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-8628(19961122)67:6<523::AID-AJMG3>3.0.CO;2-I | [A] - BERTRAND G. WINSBERG ET AL., "Association of the dopamine transporter gene (DAT1) with poor methylphenidate response", J. AM. ACAD. CHILD ADOLESC. PSYCHIATRY, (199912), vol. 38, no. 12, pages 1474 - 1477, XP002958568 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00004583-199912000-00006 | [A] - OKABE ET AL., "Alternative splicing of the C-terminal domain regulates cell surface expression of the NMDA receptor NR1 subunit", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (199909), vol. 19, no. 18, pages 7781 - 7792, XP002958570 | [A] - MUNDO ET AL., "Lack of linkage disequilibrium between serotonin transporter protein gene (SLC6A4) and bipolar disorder", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETICS (NEUROPSYCHIATRIC GENETICS), (2000), vol. 96, pages 379 - 383, XP002958569 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1096-8628(20000612)96:3<379::AID-AJMG27>3.0.CO;2-E | [A] - ERIKSSON ET AL., "Further investigation of citalopram on alcohol consumption in heavy drinkers: responsiveness possibly linked to the DRD2 A2/A2 genotype", ALCOHOL, (200105), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 15 - 23, XP002958571 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0741-8329(01)00137-9 | [A] - HO ET AL., "An allelic association study of monoamine oxidase B in Parkinson's disease", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY, (199503), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 403 - 405, XP002958572 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.410370318 | [AP] - SERRITTI ET AL., "No association between dopamine D2 and D4 receptor gene variants and antidepressant activity of two selective serotonin reuptake inhibitors", PSYCHIATRY RESEARCH, (200111), vol. 104, pages 195 - 203, XP002958573 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-1781(01)00324-9 | [AP] - ROSMOND ET AL., "Polymorphism in exon 6 of the dopamine D2 receptor gene (DRD2) is associated with elevated blood pressure and personality disorders in men", JOURNAL OF HUMAN HYPERTENSION, (200108), vol. 15, pages 553 - 558, XP002958574 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.jhh.1001231 |