EP1417810 - MOVABLE ACCESS POINTS AND REPEATERS FOR MINIMIZING COVERAGE AND CAPACITY CONSTRAINTS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK AND A METHOD FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meshnetworks, Inc. 485 Keller Road, Suite 250 Maitland, FL 32751 / US | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARAHI, Masood 2802 North Torryes Peak Dr. Superior, CO 80027 / US | 02 /
STANFORTH, Peter 1770 Seneca Blvd. Winter Springs, FL 32708 / US | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | ||
Former [2005/03] | Perkins, Sarah Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02757102.5 | 15.08.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002US25801 | Priority number, date | US20010929030 | 15.08.2001 Original published format: US 929030 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03017597 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417810 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/66, H04L12/28, H04Q7/32 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (KR);
H04L2012/5603 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2004/20] | H04L12/56, H04L12/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | 13.02.2004 | LT | 13.02.2004 | LV | 13.02.2004 | MK | 13.02.2004 | RO | 13.02.2004 | SI | 13.02.2004 | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHE ZUGRIFFSPUNKTE UND ZWISCHENVERSTÄRKER ZUR MINIMIERUNG VON ABDECKUNGS- UND KAPAZITÄTSBESCHRÄNKUNGEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2004/20] | English: | MOVABLE ACCESS POINTS AND REPEATERS FOR MINIMIZING COVERAGE AND CAPACITY CONSTRAINTS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK AND A METHOD FOR USING THE SAME | [2004/20] | French: | POINTS D'ACCES MOBILES ET REPETEURS PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE AU MINIMUM LES CONTRAINTES DE COUVERTURE ET DE CAPACITE DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION AFFERENT | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2010 | 07.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0482503 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 17-20,24-27,31,32 * column 2, lines 13-39 *; | [X]WO9639002 (GAVRILOVICH CHARLES D [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9-12,14,17,18,20,24,25,27,31,32 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 28 * * page 9, lines 14-16 * * page 12, lines 6-8 *; | [X]WO9828865 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-20,24-27,31,32 * page 2, lines 7-30 *; | [A]US5872773 (KATZELA IRENE [US], et al) [A] 21 * figures 1-15 *; | [A]US6275707 (REED JOHN DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 22,23* column 1, lines 28-45 * | International search | [YP]US6366568 (BOLGIANO D RIDGELY [US], et al); | [YP]US6405049 (HERROD ALLAN [US], et al); | [AP]US6359872 (MAHANY RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]US6067297 (BEACH ROBERT [US]) |