EP1539955 - G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR POLYNUCLEOTIDES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company P.O. Box 4000, Route 206 and Provinceline Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEDER, John, N. 277 Dutchtown Zion Road Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
RAMANATHAN, Chandra, S. 41 Alison Avenue Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | 03 /
GOPAL, Shuba 430 E. 63rd. St. Apt. 11-I New York, NY 10021 / US | 04 /
MINTIER, Gabriel, A. 318 Morrison Avenue Hightstown, NJ 08520 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02757144.7 | 15.08.2002 | [2005/24] | WO2002US26017 | Priority number, date | US20010313658P | 20.08.2001 Original published format: US 313658 P | US20010318675P | 12.09.2001 Original published format: US 318675 P | US20010340703P | 30.10.2001 Original published format: US 340703 P | US20010333417P | 26.11.2001 Original published format: US 333417 P | US20010338367P | 06.12.2001 Original published format: US 338367 P | US20020355596P | 06.02.2002 Original published format: US 355596 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03016478 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539955 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/16, C12N15/00, C07K14/00, C07K16/00, G01N33/566 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/705 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | 19.03.2004 | LT | 19.03.2004 | LV | 19.03.2004 | MK | 19.03.2004 | RO | 19.03.2004 | SI | 19.03.2004 | Title | German: | POLYNUKLEOTIDE G-PROTEIN-GEKOPPELTER REZEPTOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2005/24] | English: | G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR POLYNUCLEOTIDES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2005/24] | French: | POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT POUR LES RECEPTEURS COUPLES AUX PROTEINES G ET METHODES D'UTILISATION | [2005/24] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 03.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/32] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0040724 (LEXICON GENETICS INC [US]) [A] *Whole document*; | [X]WO0119983 (SOLVAY PHARM BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: claims 1 and 15 and pages 5 and 6*; | [X]WO0136471 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: claims 57 and 59*; | [X]WO0157085 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: SEQ ID NOs:15 and 36 and claims 1 and 5*; | [X]WO0159113 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: SEQ ID NOs:52 and 55*; | [PX]WO0198351 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: claims 1 and 11*; | [PX]WO0224726 (CHEMCOM SA [BE], et al) [PX] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: SEQ ID NOs: 543-546*; | [PX]WO0240541 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: SEQ ID NOs:15 and 35 and claims 1 and 5*; | [PX]WO0246415 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: SEQ ID NOs:30 and 62 and claims 85 and 117*; | [PX]WO02061087 (LIFESPAN BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: claims 1 and 21 and figure 1*; | [E]EP1270724 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [E] 1-20 *Whole document, in particular: SEQ ID NOs: 425 and 426 and claims 1 and 2 *; | [X] - "Homo sapiens chromosome 11 clone RP11-1083I3 map 11, WORKING DRAFT SEQUENCE, 21 unordered pieces.", EMBL, (20001106), Database accession no. AC084434, URL: EBI, XP002392694 [X] 1 *100 % identity over 961 (q:s=1-961:84040-85000) with SEQ ID NO:10 of the application* | [A] - SADEE W ET AL, "Genetic variations in human G protein-coupled receptors: implications for drug therapy.", AAPS PHARMSCI [ELECTRONIC RESOURCE]. 2001, (2001), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1522-1059, page E22, XP002375937 [A] *Whole document* | International search | [Y]WO0040724 (LEXICON GENETICS INC [US]); | [Y] - DONG ET AL, "A diverse family of GPCRs expressed in specific subsets of sensory neurons", CELL, (20010907), vol. 106, pages 619 - 632, XP002243670 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00483-4 |