EP1409313 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY TRIGGERING A DECELERATION IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/34] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOOP, Michael Seestr. 61/4 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
BRAEUCHLE, Goetz Schuetzenweg 2 74934 Reichertshausen / DE | 03 /
WINNER, Hermann Theodor-Roessler-Str. 18 76467 Bietigheim / DE | 04 /
WEILKES, Michael Gutenbergstrasse 28 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | 05 /
HEINEBRODT, Martin Breitscheidstrasse 133 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 06 /
UHLER, Werner Augsteiner Str. 11 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 07 /
HERMSEN, Wolfgang Auf der Heide 20 61267 Neu-Anspach / DE | 08 /
THIELE, Joachim Heilbronner Str. 86 70732 Tamm / DE | 09 /
STAEMPFLE, Martin Buchenlandweg 95 89075 Ulm / DE | 10 /
OECHSLE, Fred Schwaikheimer Str. 46 71642 Ludwigsburg / DE | 11 /
WILHELM, Ulf Scheibbser Str. 103 71277 Rutesheim / DE | [2004/21] |
Former [2004/17] | 01 /
KNOOP, Michael Seestr. 61/4 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
02 /
BRAEUCHLE, Goetz Schuetzenweg 2 74934 Reichertshausen / DE | |||
03 /
WINNER, Hermann Theodor-Roessler-Str. 18 76467 Bietigheim / DE | |||
04 /
WEILKES, Michael Gutenbergstrasse 28 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | |||
05 /
HEINEBRODT, Martin Breitscheidstrasse 133 70176 Stuttgart / DE | |||
06 /
UHLER, Werner Augsteiner Str. 11 76646 Bruchsal / DE | |||
07 /
HERMSEN, Wolfgang Jesinger Str. 46/2 73230 Kirchheim / DE | |||
08 /
THIELE, Joachim Heilbronner Str. 86 70732 Tamm / DE | |||
09 /
STAEMPFLE, Martin Buchenlandweg 95 89075 Ulm / DE | |||
10 /
OECHSLE, Fred Schwaikheimer Str. 46 71642 Ludwigsburg / DE | |||
11 /
WILHELM, Ulf Scheibbser Str. 103 71277 Rutesheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02758088.5 | 11.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002DE02543 | Priority number, date | DE2001133028 | 11.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10133028 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03006289 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409313 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409313 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/22, B60R21/01 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
B60T7/22 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01259 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01311 (EP,US);
B60R21/0134 (EP,US);
B60T2201/02 (EP,US);
B60T2201/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2006/34] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN AUSLÖSEN EINER VERZÖGERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2004/17] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY TRIGGERING A DECELERATION IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2004/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DECLENCHER AUTOMATIQUEMENT UNE DECELERATION D'UN VEHICULE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US6085151 (FARMER MICHAEL E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 11, line 33 - column 13, line 57; figures 9,10 * [A] 4-9; | [YA]DE19748898 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 1 - line 35; figure - * [A] 4-9; | [DA]DE19547111 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [DA] - WINNER ET AL, "Adaptive Cruise Control System Aspects and Development Trends", SAE TRANSACTIONS, SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS, INC., WARRENDALE, PA, US, (1996), vol. 105, no. 961010, ISSN 0096-736X, pages 1412 - 1421, XP002124577 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4271/961010 | by applicant | DE19547111 | - Adaptive cruise control system- aspects and development trends, Winner, Witte et al,SAE paper 96 10 10,SAE International Congress and Exposition, Detroit, 26-29. Februar 1996 |