EP1430494 - TAPE OR RIBBON SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inter Primo A/S Vestergade 1 1456 Kobenhavn K / DK | [2004/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMSEN, Jesper, Helveg Norremarksvej 264 DK-6800 Varde / DK | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Johnny, Varnke Langelinie 37, 2. th. DK-7100 Vejle / DK | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
THOMSEN, Jesper, Helveg N rremarksvej 264 DK-6800 Varde / DK | ||
02 /
PEDERSEN, Johnny, Varnke Langelinie 37, 2. th. DK-7100 Vejle / DK | Representative(s) | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S, Vester Sögade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 02758182.6 | 21.08.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002DK00550 | Priority number, date | DK20010001247 | 22.08.2001 Original published format: DK 200101247 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03019594 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430494 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430494 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/02, H01H13/06 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H01H3/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAND- ODER RIBBON-SCHALTER | [2004/26] | English: | TAPE OR RIBBON SWITCH | [2004/26] | French: | CONTACTEUR EN BANDE OU RUBAN | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 15.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2005 | BG | 12.01.2005 | CH | 12.01.2005 | CZ | 12.01.2005 | EE | 12.01.2005 | FI | 12.01.2005 | FR | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | IT | 12.01.2005 | LI | 12.01.2005 | NL | 12.01.2005 | SK | 12.01.2005 | TR | 12.01.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | SE | 12.04.2005 | ES | 23.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | CY | 21.08.2005 | LU | 21.08.2005 | IE | 22.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/04] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IT | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
CY | 21.08.2005 | ||
LU | 21.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
IT | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
CY | 21.08.2005 | ||
LU | 21.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
CY | 21.08.2005 | ||
LU | 21.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
CY | 21.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
EE | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
TR | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
FR | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
NL | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SK | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BG | 12.01.2005 | ||
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BG | 12.01.2005 | |
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
SE | 12.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 12.01.2005 | |
FI | 12.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 12.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2770696 (KOENIG ROBERT H) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 14 *; | [A]US2896042 (KOENIG ROBERT H) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 5 *; | [A]US3717735 (KOENIG R) [A] 1-14* column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 26 *; | [X]US3812313 (WOLF W, et al) [X] 1,4,5,8-12 * column 1, line 55 - column 4, line 61 *; | [A]US6053051 (YAMADA YOSHIHARU [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 1, lines 5-59 * |