EP1419041 - MIXING AND KNEADING DEVICE FOR POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ponzielli, Giuseppe 21033 Cittiglio / IT | [2004/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Ritscher, Thomas, et al Ritscher & Partner AG Resirain 1 8125 Zollikerberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Ritscher, Thomas, et al Ritscher & Partner AG Zollikerstrasse 19 8702 Zollikon/Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2004/21] | Ritscher, Thomas, Dr. Ritscher & Partner AG, Zollikerstrasse 19, Postfach 372 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02758696.5 | 16.08.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002IB03315 | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00820 | 21.08.2001 Original published format: IT TO20010820 | [2004/24] |
Former [2004/21] | IT2001TO00082 | 21.08.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018288 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1419041 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1419041 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/00, B29C47/40, B29C47/50, B29B7/48 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
B29C45/1816 (EP,US);
B29B7/487 (EP,US);
B29C2045/466 (EP,US);
B29C45/54 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/297 (EP,US);
B29C48/402 (EP,US);
B29C48/54 (EP,US);
B29C48/55 (EP,US);
B29C48/57 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCH- UND KNETVORRICHTUNG FÜR KUNSTSTOFFE | [2004/21] | English: | MIXING AND KNEADING DEVICE FOR POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [2004/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PETRIR ET MELANGER DES COMPOSITIONS POLYMERES | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 14.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.05.2006 | CH | 03.05.2006 | CY | 03.05.2006 | CZ | 03.05.2006 | EE | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | LI | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | SK | 03.05.2006 | BG | 03.08.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | IE | 16.08.2006 | LU | 16.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 03.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
LU | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | BE | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 03.05.2006 | |
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 03.05.2006 | |
CZ | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | CH | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 03.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3746489 (RIZZI M, et al) [A] 1-17 * column A * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 8 * * column 5, line 6 - line 23 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4746478 (FUJISAKI HIROMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0907492 (PONZIELLI GIUSEPPE [IT]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [X]EP1002633 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-13,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 5 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 13 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1099525 (FERIOLI FILIPPO SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-3,7-15,17 * abstract * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 32 * * figures 5-7; claim - * |