EP1419263 - YEAST EXPRESSION SYSTEMS, METHODS OF PRODUCING POLYPEPTIDES IN YEAST, AND COMPOSITIONS RELATING TO SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Pharmacologics, Inc. Doctors Park, Suite 402, 1517 Nicholasville Road Lexington, KY 40503 / US | [2004/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Mike, A. 1276 Scoville Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/21] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02759181.7 | 25.07.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002US23586 | Priority number, date | US20010915815 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: US 915815 | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03010288 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1419263 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/525 (EP,US);
C12N15/815 (EP,US);
C12N9/78 (EP,US);
C12Y305/03006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEFE-EXPRESSIONSSYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYPEPTIDEN IN HEFE SOWIE DAMIT IN VERBINDUNG STEHENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2004/21] | English: | YEAST EXPRESSION SYSTEMS, METHODS OF PRODUCING POLYPEPTIDES IN YEAST, AND COMPOSITIONS RELATING TO SAME | [2004/21] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXPRESSION DE LEVURE, METHODES PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES POLYPEPTIDES DANS LA LEVURE ET COMPOSITIONS RELATIVES A CES SYSTEMES D'EXPRESSION | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 07.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9914347 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [XL] - HOLLENBERG C P ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF RECOMBINANT PROTEINS BY METHYLOTROPHIC YEASTS", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (1997), vol. 8, ISSN 0958-1669, pages 554 - 560, XP000939179 [XL] 1,3-18,20-27,32,34-36,38,39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(97)80028-6 | [XL] - GELLISSEN G, "Heterologous protein production in methylotrophic yeasts", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200012), vol. 54, no. 6, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 741 - 750, XP002333889 [XL] 1,3-18,20-27,32,34-36,38,39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530000464 | [A] - YUZO YAMADA ET AL, "The phylogenetic relationships of methanol-assimilating yeasts based on the partial sequences of 18S and 25S ribosomal RNAS: the proposal of komagataella gen. November (saccharomycetaceae)", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPAN SOC. FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND AGROCHEM, TOKYO, JP, (1995), vol. 59, no. 3, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 439 - 444, XP002971182 [A] * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5002876 (SREEKRISHNA KOTIKANYADAN [US], et al); | [X]US5707828 (SREEKRISHNA KOTIKANYADAN [US], et al); | [X]US5804183 (FILPULA DAVID RAY [US], et al); | [Y]US5849524 (KONDO KEIJI [JP], et al); | [X]US6258559 (ZAMOST BRUCE L [US]) |