EP1412961 - MOBILE MINIATURE X-RAY SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moxtek, Inc. 452 West 1260 North Orem, UT 84057 / US | [2004/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNER, Clark 9557 South 6200 West Payson, UT 84651 / US | 02 /
REYES, Arturo 453 North 500 East Orem, UT 84057 / US | 03 /
PEW, Hans, K. 15 Davis Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 04 /
LUND, Mark, W. 969 East 200 North Orem, UT 84057 / US | 05 /
LINES, Michael 211 South 1680 West Provo, UT 84601 / US | 06 /
MOODY, Paul 1443 Noelle Road Sandy, UT 84092 / US | 07 /
VORONOV, Sergei 8 Wymount Terrace Provo, UT 84604 / US | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02759216.1 | 30.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002US24124 | Priority number, date | US20010308637P | 30.07.2001 Original published format: US 308637 P | US20020208646 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: US 208646 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03012816 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1412961 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/223, H01J35/00 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
H01J35/04 (EP,US);
G01N23/223 (EP,US);
H01J35/186 (EP,US);
H01J35/32 (EP,US);
G01N2223/076 (EP,US);
G01N33/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/18] | H01J35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE MINIATUR-RÖNTGENQUELLE | [2004/18] | English: | MOBILE MINIATURE X-RAY SOURCE | [2004/18] | French: | SOURCE DE RAYONS X MINIATURE MOBILE | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 01.12.2005 | Observations by third parties | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4184097 (AUGE CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-13 * column W *; | [A]US4679219 (OZAKI HIDEMICHI [JP]) [A] 1-13* column W *; | [A]US5077777 (DALY RICHARD H [US]) [A] 1-13 * column W *; | [X]US6134300 (TREBES JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column A * * column 4, line 8 - line 18; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]USRE35383E (MILLER ROBERT B [US], et al); | [Y]US5428658 (OETTINGER PETER E [US], et al); | [Y]US5621780 (SMITH DONALD O [US], et al) | other | US4184097 | US4679219 | US5077777 | - "Machlett CW-250-T Tube (ca. 1940s)", WEBPAGE EXTRACT - ORAU.ORG, page 2 PG-S, XP002994115 | - XSI INC, "Micro X-ray tube", WEBPAGE EXTRACT - XSIINC, page 1 PG, XP002994116 |