EP1423389 - PYRAZOLO-PYRIDINES FOR THE TREATMENT OF HERPES INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [2007/23] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNS, Brian A.; c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 02 /
GUDMUNDSSON, Kristjan; c/o GlaxoSmithKline Five Moore Drive, PO Box 13398 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Cooke, Tracey GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Cooke, Tracey (GB) GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road GB-Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02759464.7 | 27.08.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002US27251 | Priority number, date | US20010318203P | 07.09.2001 Original published format: US 318203 P | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022845 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423389 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423389 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P31/22 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRAZOLO-PYRIDINE FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON HERPES-ANSTECKUNGEN | [2004/23] | English: | PYRAZOLO-PYRIDINES FOR THE TREATMENT OF HERPES INFECTIONS | [2004/23] | French: | PYRAZOLO-PYRIDINES SERVANT AU TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS HERPETIQUES | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2007 | CH | 06.06.2007 | CY | 06.06.2007 | CZ | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | EE | 06.06.2007 | FI | 06.06.2007 | LI | 06.06.2007 | NL | 06.06.2007 | SK | 06.06.2007 | TR | 06.06.2007 | IE | 27.08.2007 | LU | 27.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | BG | 06.09.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.08.2007 | ||
LU | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
NL | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 06.06.2007 | |
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9856377 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * page 27, line 20 - line 31; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO0026216 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-40 * page 6, line 35 - page 8, line 14; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO0052008 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-40 * page 4, line 29 - page 6, line 14; example -; claim - *; | [A]US6207675 (CARRY JEAN-CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-40 * column 12, line 31 - line 45; example -; claim - *; | [PY]WO0248147 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PY] 1-40 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 29; example -; claim - *; | [PY]WO0248148 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PY] 1-40* page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 29; example -; claim - *; | [A] - A. AKAHANE ET. AL., "Discovery of 6-Oxo-3-(2-phenylpyrazolo[1,5-a]pyridin-3-yl)- 1(6H)-pyridazinebutanoic Acid (FK838). A Novel Non-Xanthine Adenosine A1 Receptor Antagonist with Potent Diuretic Activity.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19990311), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 779 - 83, XP001118346 [A] 1-40 * Table 1, compound no. 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm980671w |